Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/12/2018 at 10:37:40 (UTC).

NATIONSTAR -V- REECE, ETAL

Case Summary

On 09/11/2015 NATIONSTAR filed an Other - Declaratory Judgment lawsuit against REECE, ETAL. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3251

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Declaratory Judgment

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC

THOMAS F REECE

STATE OF CALIFORNIA EMPLOYMENTDEVELOPMENT

STATE OF CALIFORNIA FRANCHISE TAX BOARD

Sacramento, CA 95741-1720

COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO

CITIBANK

ANY AND ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN, CLAIMING ANY

COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO,

COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO, CENTRAL COLLECTIO

LIU Q REECE

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A

COUNTRY WIDE HOME LOANS , INC

Defendants and Cross Defendants

THOMAS F REECE

LIU JEAN REECE

CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC.

STATE OF CALIFORNIA EMPLOYMENTDEVELOPMENT

STATE OF CALIFORNIA FRANCHISE TAX BOARD

Sacramento, CA 95741-1720

COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO, CENTRAL

COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

CITIBANK

LIU JEAN QUAN-REECE

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC.

6 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

ALDRIDGE PITE, LLP

4375 Jutland Dr-Ste 200 P.O. Box 17935

San Diego, CA 92177-0935

AKERMAN LLP

601 West Fifth Street Suite 300

Los Angeles, CA 90071

BRYAN CAVE LLP

1700 Lincoln St Ste 4100

Denver, CO 80203

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF KENNETH J FREED

14226 Ventura Blvd Po Box 5914

Sherman Oaks, CA 91413

FRANCHISE TAX BOARD

Po Box 1720

Sacramento, CA 95741-1720

COUNTY COUNSEL

385 North Arrowhead Ave 3Rd Floor

San Bernardino, CA 92415

 

Court Documents

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 09/11/2015 OF NATIONSTAR MORTGAGELLC FILED BY NATIONSTAR MORTGAGELLC, WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 09/11/2015 OF NATIONSTAR MORTGAGELLC FILED BY NATIONSTAR MORTGAGELLC, WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; DISMISS COMPLAINT OF NATIONSTAR MORTGAGELLC, ON 09/06/17

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 09/11/2015 OF NATIONSTAR MORTGAGELLC FILED BY NATIONSTAR MORTGAGELLC, WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 09/11/2015 OF NATIONSTAR MORTGAGELLC FILED BY NATIONSTAR MORTGAGELLC, WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; DISMISS COMPLAINT OF NATIONSTAR MORTGAGELLC, ON 09/06/17

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO NATIONSTAR MORTGAGELLC, WITH PREJUDICE

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO NATIONSTAR MORTGAGELLC, WITH PREJUDICE

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY NATIONSTAR MORTGAGELLC.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY NATIONSTAR MORTGAGELLC.

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED.

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED.

REPLY TO IN SUPPORT OF TO MOTION RE: DEMURRER TO DEFS AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT SET FOR HEARING ON 11/08/16 FILED BY NATIONSTAR MORTGAGELLC. (IMAGED)

REPLY TO IN SUPPORT OF TO MOTION RE: DEMURRER TO DEFS AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT SET FOR HEARING ON 11/08/16 FILED BY NATIONSTAR MORTGAGELLC. (IMAGED)

DECLARATION OF ANDREA M HICKS IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER FILED

DECLARATION OF ANDREA M HICKS IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER FILED

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED.

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO LIU Q REECE SERVED ON 09/14/16 WITH FEES OF $20.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO LIU Q REECE SERVED ON 09/14/16 WITH FEES OF $20.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET FILED AS TO CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A; PARTY SERVED ON 09/02/16 WITH COSTS OF $8.62 BY CERTIFIED MAIL.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET FILED AS TO CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A; PARTY SERVED ON 09/02/16 WITH COSTS OF $8.62 BY CERTIFIED MAIL.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON 2ND AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT OF CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC. - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON 2ND AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT OF CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC. - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: TO ALLOW THE FILING OF A SECOND AMENDED CROSS COMP FILED.

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: TO ALLOW THE FILING OF A SECOND AMENDED CROSS COMP FILED.; Minutes; LEAVE OF COURT GRANTED ON 1ST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT OF CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC. FOR 20 DAYS TO FILE SECOND AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT.

AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 1ST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT OF CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC.

AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 1ST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT OF CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO CITIBANK SERVED ON 11/02/15 WITH FEES OF $223.25.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO CITIBANK SERVED ON 11/02/15 WITH FEES OF $223.25.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/28/15 WITH COSTS OF $223.25 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/28/15 WITH COSTS OF $223.25 FILED.

PROOF OF SUB SERVICE AS TO ALL UNKNOWNS SERVED ON 102915 FEES OF 49.95 FILED.

PROOF OF SUB SERVICE AS TO ALL UNKNOWNS SERVED ON 102915 FEES OF 49.95 FILED.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

69 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2017
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO 2ND AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT OF CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC. FILED BY CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC., WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; SET ASIDE DISPOSITION OF DEFENDANT THOMAS F REECE, LIU Q REECE.; SET ASIDE REQUEST FOR DEFAULT AS TO THOMAS F REECE, LIU Q REECE; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO COUNTRY WIDE HOME LOANS , INC, WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF REJECTION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - COUNTRYWIDE SENT.; Minutes; REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS, INC. IS RETUNRED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING; REASON(S): 1) CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON 12/01/15 IS NO LONGER ACTIVE. THE MOST CURRENT VERSION OF; THE CROSS-COMPLAINT (2ND AMENDED) WAS FILED ON 07/22/16. PLEASE SPECIFY THE DISMISSAL IS AS TO; THIS CROSS DEFENDANT ON THIS VERSION OF THE CROSS-COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • COURT TRIAL SET FOR COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 09/11/2015 OF NATIONSTAR MORTGAGELLC; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • READINESS CALENDAR; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; BRIAN S MCCARVILLE, JUDGE; CLERK: OLIVIA MCDONALD; COURT REPORTER DEENA MACIAS 9826; COURT ATTENDANT S CARR; APPEARANCES:; PARISA JASSIN APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR NATIONSTAR MORTGAGELLC.; SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY ROBERT MORRIS FOR CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; A GLOBAL SETTLEMENT HAS BEEN REACHED AND THE COMPLAINT HAS BEEN DISMISSED, HOWEVER CROSS; DEFENDANT COUNTRYWIDE HAS NOT COMPLETED ALL THE NECESSARY DOCUMENTS IN ORDER TO COMPLETE THE; SETTLEMENT.; THE COURT VACATES THE TRIAL DATE AND SETS A TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE AS TO THE CROSS COMPLAINT.; HEARINGS:; TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE SET FOR 11/08/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPT. S30; NOTICE TO BE GIVEN BY COUNSEL FOR CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC..; ; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO NATIONSTAR MORTGAGELLC, WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 09/11/2015 OF NATIONSTAR MORTGAGELLC FILED BY NATIONSTAR MORTGAGELLC, WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; DISMISS COMPLAINT OF NATIONSTAR MORTGAGELLC, ON 09/06/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): CANNOT DISMISS ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT THE 2ND ATTORNEYS SIGNATURE FOR THE 2ND.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
104 More Docket Entries
  • 10/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO, CENTRAL SERVED ON 09/25/15 WITH FEES OF $49.95.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO SERVED ON 09/25/15 WITH FEES OF $77.45.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2015
  • PARTY LIU JEAN QUAN-REECE UPDATED: NAME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2015
  • FILING FEE PAID BY NATIONSTAR MORTGAGELLC FOR FILING FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 150911-2491 $435.00; 150911-2491-CK Reference Number 63297

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2015
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S30

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COUNTRY WIDE HOME LOANS AND SUCCESSORS/ASSI is a litigant

Latest cases where Nationstar Mortgage, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where CitiBank, N.A. is a litigant