This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/17/2018 at 11:40:40 (UTC).

NATIONSTAR-V-PARRENAS

Case Summary

On 12/31/2012 NATIONSTAR-V-PARRENAS was filed as a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Chino District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0622

  • Filing Date:

    12/31/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chino District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC

Defendants

CONCHITA PARRENAS

MARIA L GALLOGO

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TFLG, A LAW CORPORATION

202 Cousteau Place Suite 260

Davis, CA 95618

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2013
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2013
  • DISMISSAL RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2013
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2013
  • ON THE UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 12/31/2012 OF NATIONSTAR MORTGAGELLC, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 01/01/13 WITH FEES OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON CONCHITA PARRENAS; PARTY SERVED ON 12/31/12 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $125.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON MARIA L GALLOGO; PARTY SERVED ON 12/31/12 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2013
  • PROOFS RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2013
  • PROOFS RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2013
  • PROOFS RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2012
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT C1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2012
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 121231-0262 $255.00; 121231-0262-CK Reference Number 809843

    Read MoreRead Less