This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/11/2018 at 23:02:43 (UTC).

NATIONAL CREDIT -V- CASTILLO

Case Summary

On 05/04/2011 NATIONAL CREDIT filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CASTILLO. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5802

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NATIONAL CREDIT ADJUSTERS LLC

Defendant

LORENA CASTILLO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NELSON & KENNARD

2180 Harvard Street Suite 160

Sacramento, CA 95815

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2012
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2011
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2011
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2011
  • VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 11/04/11 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S34.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2011
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO LORENA CASTILLO SERVED ON 05/18/11 WITH FEES OF $69.50.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CASE AND PARTY INFORMATION ADDED; Minutes; Receipt: 110504-2273 $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S34

    Read MoreRead Less