Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/03/2018 at 03:03:10 (UTC).

NATIONAL COMMUNITY RENAISSANCE-V-CONFORTI

Case Summary

On 06/30/2017 NATIONAL COMMUNITY RENAISSANCE-V-CONFORTI was filed as a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1483

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Barstow District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NATIONAL COMMUNITYRENAISSANCEOF CALIFORNI

Defendant

CASSANDRA CONFORTI

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EDWARD M PALMER

229 N Riverside Ave

Rialto, CA 92376

 

Court Documents

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( POSSESSION)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( POSSESSION)

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 06/30/2017 OF NATIONAL COMMUNITYRENAISSANCEOF CALIFORNI ORDERED ENTERED 08/16/17; JUDGMENT FOR: NATIONAL COMMUNITYRENAISSANCEOF CALIFORNI; JUDGMENT AGAINST: CASSANDRA CONFORTI, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: CASSANDRA CONFORTI, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; VACATE SCUD HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 08/22/17 AT 09:00 IN DEPARTMENT B3X.; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON CASSANDRA CONFORTI, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON CASSANDRA CONFORTI, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 07/18/17 WITH FEES OF $42.50.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 07/18/17 WITH FEES OF $42.50.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET BY POSTING ON CASSANDRA CONFORTI; POSTED ON 07/18/17 WITH FEES OF $42.50. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET BY POSTING ON CASSANDRA CONFORTI; POSTED ON 07/18/17 WITH FEES OF $42.50. (IMAGED)

NOTICE OF RETURNED DOCUMENTS SENT.

NOTICE OF RETURNED DOCUMENTS SENT.; Minutes; THE JUDGMENT PACKET IS BEING RETURNED BECAUSE IT IS INCORRECT. THE POS OF POSTING DOES NOT; STATE, "UNDER THE PENALTY OF PERJURY..." THAT THE FORMS WERE MAILED. THE RECEIPT OF MAILING; DOES NOT SUFFICE. PLEASE CORRECT THE POS BEFORE RESUBMITTING

ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR POSTING AND MAILING GRANTED AND FILED WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $20.00.

ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR POSTING AND MAILING GRANTED AND FILED WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $20.00.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170630-0513 $255.00; 170630-0513-CK Reference Number 80564

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • ORIG WRIT & COPIES PLACED IN L&M BIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • WRIT FEE OF $25.00 PAID; Minutes; Receipt: 170817-0153 $25.00; 170817-0153-CK Reference Number 80821

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( POSSESSION)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 06/30/2017 OF NATIONAL COMMUNITYRENAISSANCEOF CALIFORNI ORDERED ENTERED 08/16/17; JUDGMENT FOR: NATIONAL COMMUNITYRENAISSANCEOF CALIFORNI; JUDGMENT AGAINST: CASSANDRA CONFORTI, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: CASSANDRA CONFORTI, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; VACATE SCUD HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 08/22/17 AT 09:00 IN DEPARTMENT B3X.; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON CASSANDRA CONFORTI, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 08/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURNED DOCUMENTS SENT.; Minutes; THE JUDGMENT PACKET IS BEING RETURNED BECAUSE IT IS INCORRECT. THE POS OF POSTING DOES NOT; STATE, "UNDER THE PENALTY OF PERJURY..." THAT THE FORMS WERE MAILED. THE RECEIPT OF MAILING; DOES NOT SUFFICE. PLEASE CORRECT THE POS BEFORE RESUBMITTING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR POSTING AND MAILING GRANTED AND FILED WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $20.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO POST SUMMONS & COMPLAINT FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170717-0825 $20.00; 170717-0825-CK Reference Number 80675

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT B1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $815.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $27.47.--BEGINNING ON 07/01/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170630-0513 $255.00; 170630-0513-CK Reference Number 80564

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NATIONAL COMMUNITY RENAISSANCE OF CALIFORNIA DBA LITTLE LAKE VILLAGE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer EDWARD M PALMER