This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 04/28/2021 at 00:44:11 (UTC).

NATIONAL COMMERCIAL-V-INSIGHT SURGICAL ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/26/2020 NATIONAL COMMERCIAL-V-INSIGHT SURGICAL was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5800

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NATIONAL COMMERCIAL RECOVERY, INC

NATIONAL COMMERCIAL RECOVERY, INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

THE BREW & MEATBALL CO

BLAIR SMITH AND ASSOCIATES

Defendants

INSIGHT SURGICAL SOLUTIONS, INC

CARLOS DUARTE

DANIELLE DUARTE

INSIGHT SURGICAL SOLUTIONS, LLCA CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

DUARTE, DANIELLE

Not Yet Classified

CONV

Not Classified By Court

GALVAN, DANIELLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GLENN A BESNYL, SBN 165587

750 N Diamond Bar Bl Suite 220

Diamond Bar, CA 91765

Besnyl, Glenn Alan

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) OF NA

07/08/2020: JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) OF NA

DECLARATION OF GLENN A BESNYL ISO PERSONAL LIABILI

07/02/2020: DECLARATION OF GLENN A BESNYL ISO PERSONAL LIABILI

DECLARATION OF RON SMITH ISO PLA'S REQ FOR ENTRY O

07/02/2020: DECLARATION OF RON SMITH ISO PLA'S REQ FOR ENTRY O

DECLARATION OF SHANA ANDROUS ISO REQ FOR ENTRY OF

07/02/2020: DECLARATION OF SHANA ANDROUS ISO REQ FOR ENTRY OF

DECLARATION RE- ISO TREBLE DAMAGES PURSUANT TO CC

07/02/2020: DECLARATION RE- ISO TREBLE DAMAGES PURSUANT TO CC

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDG

07/02/2020: DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDG

DECLARATION RE- ISO ATTY FEES FILED BY NATIONAL CO

07/02/2020: DECLARATION RE- ISO ATTY FEES FILED BY NATIONAL CO

DECLARATION RE- ISO INTEREST CALCULATION FILED BY

07/02/2020: DECLARATION RE- ISO INTEREST CALCULATION FILED BY

DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION

07/02/2020: DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ALREADY ENTERED. REQUEST

07/02/2020: REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ALREADY ENTERED. REQUEST

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST INSIGHT SURGICAL

05/29/2020: REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST INSIGHT SURGICAL

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO CARLOS DUARTE, WITH PREJUDIC

05/27/2020: DISMISSAL FILED AS TO CARLOS DUARTE, WITH PREJUDIC

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP-PET AS TO

04/14/2020: PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP-PET AS TO

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP-PET AS TO

04/14/2020: PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP-PET AS TO

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

02/26/2020: CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

NOTICE IMAGED

02/26/2020: NOTICE IMAGED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

02/26/2020: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

02/26/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketOSC Re: Status of Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740; Original Type: OSC Re: Status of Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketOSC Re: Service Completion Pursuant to CRC 3.740; Original Type: OSC Re: Service Completion Pursuant to CRC 3.740; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • FinancialCONV; Counter Payment; Receipt # 20200812-0239; ConversionPayment; $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • FinancialCONV; Transaction Assessment; $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment Issued; Comment: ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED 200812-0239-CK MJX/ 40.00 PAYMT 200812-0239-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 15947

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DispositionJudgment; Judgment Type: Judgment; Comment; Comment: (2/26/2020 - 0001 - COMComplaint (Limited Jurisdiction)); Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To: NATIONAL COMMERCIAL RECOVERY, INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION; Awarded Against; INSIGHT SURGICAL SOLUTIONS, LLCA CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY; DUARTE, DANIELLE; Amount; Damages: $6,346.59; Pre-Judgment Interest: $577.70; Attorney Fees: $1,200.00; Costs: $320.00; Other: $3,852.70; Other Comment: Principle; Total: $12296.99

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment on Complaint Filed; Comment: JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) OF NATIONAL COMMERCIAL RECOVERY, INC FILED JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) OF NATIONAL COMMERCIAL RECOVERY, INC ORDERED ENTERED 07/08/20 JUDGMENT FOR: NATIONAL COMMERCIAL RECOVERY, INC JUDGMENT AGAINST: INSIGHT SURGICAL SOLUTIONS, LLC, DANIELLE DUARTE JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $3,852.70 INTEREST $577.70 ATTORNEY FEES $1,200.00 COSTS $320.00 AND DAMAGES $6,346.59. JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $12296.99 STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Filed; Comment: DECLARATION OF GLENN A BESNYL ISO PERSONAL LIABILITY AGAINST DEF FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff First Paper Fee Previously Paid in Full; Comment: PLAINTIFF NATIONAL COMMERCIAL RECOVERY, INC FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: FILING FEE PAID BY NATIONAL COMMERCIAL RECOVERY, INC FOR NEW FILING FEE 200227-0217-CK CLS/ 240.00 PAYMT 200227-0217-CK REFERENCE NUMBER CK#18136

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Assignment Received; Comment: CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Imaged; Comment: NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketPrayed for Amount and/or Damages in the Amount of; Comment: PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $6,352.70

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned for All Purposes; Comment: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed; Comment: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Comment: SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Filed; Comment: COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketUpdate Party Address; Comment: PARTY INSIGHT SURGICAL SOLUTIONS, LLC UPDATED: CORRECTED NAME

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONV is a litigant

Latest cases where BLAIR SMITH AND ASOCIATES is a litigant

Latest cases where NATIONAL COMMERCIAL RECOVERY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA BLAIR SMITH AND ASSOCIATES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BESNYL GLENN ALAN