Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/25/2018 at 01:52:18 (UTC).

NARIKE -V- VALERO GAS

Case Summary

On 09/14/2011 NARIKE filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against VALERO GAS. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Victorville District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4721

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Victorville District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DONALD NARIKE

Defendants

GURPRETT SINGH SANDHU

VALERO GAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TIMOTHY L TAGGART

999 N. Pacific Street A Bldg- Box 1

Oceanside, CA 92054

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2012
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CMC & STATUS OF DEFTS BANKRUPTCY; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2012
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE; REMAINING PARTY GURPRETT SINGH SANDHU; (DISCHARGED IN BANKRUPTCY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2012
  • FILE SENT TO V8 FOR HRG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2012
  • RESPONSE TO OSC FILED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2012
  • RESPONSE TO OSC RE: SANCTIONS AND DISMISSAL * FILED.; Minutes; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2012
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS/PLAINTIFF FTA & DISMISSAL; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; JOHN P VANDER FEER, JUDGE; CLERK: DEEANN MATTKE; COURT REPORTER TRACY NESTLE 12649; COURT ATTENDANT C TURKAL; APPEARANCES:; SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY BRANDON WOOD FOR PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL.; DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL PREPARES A DECLARATION RE: WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED.; THE COURT STRIKES SANCTIONS AT THIS TIME.; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : CMC & STATUS OF DEFTS BANKRUPTCY SET FOR 11/05/12 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT V8.; PLAINTIFF IS TO GIVE THE COURT AN UPDATE ON THE DEFENDANTS BANKRUPTCY ON NEXT HEARING DATE.; NOTICE TO BE GIVEN BY PLAITNIFFS COUNSEL.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2012
  • CASE SENT TO DEPT FOR HRG.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • NTC OF LIEN ON PROCEEDS ON JUDGMENT/ACTION/ SETTLEMENT BY COURT CALL** FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2012
  • HEARING RE: CMC/DISMISSAL OF BANKRUTPCY/DEFAULT; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; JOHN P VANDER FEER, JUDGE; CLERK: DEEANN MATTKE; COURT REPORTER TRACY NESTLE 12649; COURT ATTENDANT C TURKAL; APPEARANCES:; TIMOTHY L TAGGART FOR DONALD NARIKE NOT PRESENT; DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HELD.; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : SANCTIONS/PLAINTIFF FTA & DISMISSAL SET FOR 08/13/12 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT V8.; MS. VALERIE ROSS IS NOT APPEARING ON THIS CASE OF MR. TAGGART.; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL A COPY OF TODAYS MINUTE ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2012
  • CASE SENT TO DEPT FOR HRG.

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 12/02/2011
  • VACATE OSCSV HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 01/12/12 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT V9.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, COMPLT, NCT OF CMC FILED AS TO GURPRETT SINGH SANDHU. PARTY SERVED ON 12/01/11. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2011
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2011
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY DONALD NARIKE IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2011
  • ON THE COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2011 OF DONALD NARIKE, VALERO GAS IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2011
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2011
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2011
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY DONALD NARIKE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2011
  • CIVIL CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2011
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT V9

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TAGGART, TIMOTHY L