This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/14/2018 at 14:52:26 (UTC).

NANCI GARCIA-LARA N JOSE MANUEL SANCHEZ-AVALOS

Case Summary

On 07/11/2017 NANCI GARCIA-LARA N JOSE MANUEL SANCHEZ-AVALOS was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5866

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

NANCI GARCIA-LARA

Respondent

JOSE MANUEL SANCHEZ-AVALOS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2018
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DATE MARITAL STATUS TERMINATES 05/30/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN FILED 07/11/2017 OF NANCI GARCIA-LARA FILED; Minutes; FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN FILED 07/11/2017 OF NANCI GARCIA-LARA ORDERED ENTERED 05/30/18; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION -- JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL); DISPOSITION: JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT FILED ON JOSE MANUEL SANCHEZ-AVALOS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • NOTICE OF RETURNED JUDGMENT SENT.; Minutes; JUDGMENT RETURNED FOR THE FOLLOWING REASONS: INFORMATION REGARDING SPOUSAL SUPPORT ON FL-170; AND FL-180 DOES NOT MATCH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • COMMUNITY AND QUASI COMMUNITY PROPERTY DECLARATION OF NANCI GARCIA-LARA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY NANCI GARCIA-LARA FOR PRELIM/FINAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN FILED 07/11/2017 OF NANCI GARCIA-LARA AS TO JOSE MANUEL SANCHEZ-AVALOS.

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 07/11/2017
  • DECLARATION UNDER UCCJEA FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • COMMUNITY AND QUASI COMMUNITY PROPERTY DECLARATION OF NANCI GARCIA-LARA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY NANCI GARCIA-LARA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S46

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY NANCI GARCIA-LARA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY NANCI GARCIA-LARA IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON NANCI GARCIA-LARA FOR 1ST APPEARANCE FEE IN THE AMOUNT OF $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less