This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 05/27/2017 at 19:51:21 (UTC).

NAN-V-JENNINGS

Case Summary

On 03/27/2017 NAN-V-JENNINGS was filed as a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0660

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Barstow District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WANG NAN

Defendant

BRIAN R JENNINGS

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 04/04/17 AS TO BRAIN JENNINGS, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 04/04/17 AS TO BRAIN JENNINGS, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT BY SUB SERVICE ON 04/04/17 AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT BY SUB SERVICE ON 04/04/17 AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS, FILED.

COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 00:30 HOURS.

REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 00:30 HOURS.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 04/04/17 WITH FEES OF $40.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 04/04/17 WITH FEES OF $40.00.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON BRIAN R JENNINGS; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 04/04/17

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON BRIAN R JENNINGS; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 04/04/17

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ANSWER FILED BY BRIAN R JENNINGS; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

ANSWER FILED BY BRIAN R JENNINGS; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF ANSWER-UD BY MAIL ON 04/06/17 AS TO WANG NAN, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF ANSWER-UD BY MAIL ON 04/06/17 AS TO WANG NAN, FILED.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170327-0334 $255.00; 170327-0334-DB Reference Number 026-0019307762

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2017
  • COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:30 HRS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT BY PERSONAL SERVICE ON 04/04/17 AS TO BRAIN JENNINGS, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT BY SUB SERVICE ON 04/04/17 AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 03/27/2017 OF WANG NAN AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 00:30 HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • ON THE UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 03/27/2017 OF WANG NAN, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS IS ADDED AS A DEF.

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 04/13/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON BRIAN R JENNINGS FOR 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF $240.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY BRIAN R JENNINGS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FILED BY BRIAN R JENNINGS; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF ANSWER-UD BY MAIL ON 04/06/17 AS TO WANG NAN, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • ANSWER,REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): A PROOF OF SERVICE IS REQUIRED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT B3X

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170327-0334 $255.00; 170327-0334-DB Reference Number 026-0019307762

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.