This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/11/2018 at 14:52:25 (UTC).

MYRTLE LOUISE POPPE AKA MYRTLE L POPPE

Case Summary

On 03/17/2017 MYRTLE LOUISE POPPE AKA MYRTLE L POPPE was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0246

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PAULINE B GRUENLER

Decedent

MYRTLE LOUISE POPPE

Not Classified By Court

LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ALBREKTSON & SHUMATE, LLP

1801 Orange Tree Lane; Ste 230

Redlands, CA 92374

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY PAULINE B GRUENLER

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY PAULINE B GRUENLER

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY PAULINE B GRUENLER

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY PAULINE B GRUENLER

PETITION RE: PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY WITH FULL AIAE FILED.

PETITION RE: PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY WITH FULL AIAE FILED.

PETITION RE: PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY WITH FULL AIAE FILED.

PETITION RE: PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY WITH FULL AIAE FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2019
  • HEARING RE FINAL DISCHARGE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • ACCOUNTING REVIEW BY; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • DECLARATION AND ORDER FOR FINAL DISCHARGE FILED.; Minutes; CASE COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON FINAL DISCHARGE RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • RECEIPT RE: DISTRIBUTIVE SHARE BY TRINITY LUTHERAN CHURCH FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • RECEIPT RE: EXECUTORS COMMISSIONS BY PAULINE B. GRUENLER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • RECEIPT RE: OF DISTRIBUTIVE SHARE FAITH LUTHERAN CHURCH FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • RECEIPT RE: OF FEES BY ALBREKTSON & SHUMATE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • ORDER OF FIRST & FINAL REPORT OF EXECUTOR FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY PAULINE B GRUENLER FOR CC OF ORDR; Minutes; Receipt: 180220-0132 $26.50; 180220-0132-VS Reference Number 031-0087583082

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 03/17/2017
  • ORIGINAL WILL LODGED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY PAULINE B GRUENLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • CONFIDENTIAL STATEMENT OF BIRTH DATE AND DRIVER'S LICENSE NUMBER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • PROPOSED LETTERS RECEIVED (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S36P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION RE: PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY WITH FULL AIAE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • RECEIPT OF WILL LODGED WITH COURT (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less