This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/28/2021 at 03:19:45 (UTC).

MURRAY VS SIMPLIFIED STAFFING

Case Summary

On 03/06/2019 MURRAY filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against SIMPLIFIED STAFFING. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Schneider, Wilfred J, Jr., Pacheco, John M and Poncin, Lynn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7075

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judges

Schneider, Wilfred J, Jr.

Pacheco, John M

Poncin, Lynn

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ABRAHAM MURRAY

MURRAY, ABRAHAM

Defendants

SIMPLIFIED STAFFING LABOR SOLUTIONS,LLC

SIMPLIFIED STAFFING LABOR SOLUTIONS-ONTARIO

SIMPLIFIED LABOR STAFFING SOLUTIONS, INC

Not Yet Classified

CONV

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF KRISTEN BROWN

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF KRISTEN BROWN

900 W 17Th Street Ste C

Santa Ana, CA 92706

LAW OFFICE OF SANDRA H. CASTRO, INC

3200 Inland Empire Blvd. Ste 265

Ontario, CA 91764

Law Office of Sandra H Castro, Inc

Attorney at Law Office of Sandra H Castro, Inc

Defendant Attorney

Angel City Law

Attorney at Angel City Law

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP-PET ON SIMPLI

04/09/2019: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP-PET ON SIMPLI

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP-PET ON SIMPLI

04/09/2019: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP-PET ON SIMPLI

AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 1ST AMENDED CO

09/09/2019: AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 1ST AMENDED CO

PROOF OF SERVICE OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED

09/09/2019: PROOF OF SERVICE OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED

NOTICE OF HEARING ON TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE SET

09/09/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING ON TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE SET

ANSWER FILED BY SIMPLIFIED STAFFING LABOR SOLUTION

09/25/2019: ANSWER FILED BY SIMPLIFIED STAFFING LABOR SOLUTION

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY SIMP

12/26/2019: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY SIMP

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FOR MURRAY NAMING DOES 1 TO

01/15/2020: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FOR MURRAY NAMING DOES 1 TO

NOTICE OF HEARING ON TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE FILE

01/15/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING ON TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE FILE

ANSWER FILED BY SIMPLIFIED LABOR STAFFING SOLUTION

02/18/2020: ANSWER FILED BY SIMPLIFIED LABOR STAFFING SOLUTION

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY ABRAHAM MURRA

08/04/2020: NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY ABRAHAM MURRA

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING HILL

08/04/2020: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING HILL

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING HILL

08/04/2020: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING HILL

Stipulation Filed re:

05/26/2021: Stipulation Filed re:

Order Filed Re:

06/02/2021: Order Filed Re:

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketJury Trial; Judicial Officer: Schneider, Wilfred J, Jr.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Comment: JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketReadiness Calendar; Judicial Officer: Schneider, Wilfred J, Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: READINESS CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: READINESS CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Filed Re:; Comment: on stipulation to continue trial and trial related dates

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • FinancialMURRAY, ABRAHAM; Fax Filing; Receipt # SC-2021-31995; Law Office of Sandra H Castro, Inc; $28.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • FinancialMURRAY, ABRAHAM; Transaction Assessment; $28.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: $28.50 Visa paid in 06.01.21 for Stip & Order to Continue Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation Filed re:; Comment: to Continue Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • FinancialCONV; Counter Payment; Receipt # 20200827-0168; ConversionPayment; $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
50 More Docket Entries
  • 03/06/2019
  • FinancialMURRAY, ABRAHAM; Total Financial Assessment: $28.50; Total Payments and Credits: $28.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • DocketAttorney Added for Plaintiff; Comment: ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF ABRAHAM MURRAY FOR ABRAHAM MURRAY, ATTORNEY LAW OFFICES OF KRISTEN BROWN ADDED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff First Paper Fee Previously Paid in Full; Comment: PLAINTIFF ABRAHAM MURRAY FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: FILING FEE PAID BY ABRAHAM MURRAY FOR 1ST APP FEE 190306-0113-CK CVH/ 435.00 PAYMT 190306-0113-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 905

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Assignment Received; Comment: CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • DocketNotice Imaged; Comment: NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • DocketCase Assigned for All Purposes; Comment: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S32

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed; Comment: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Comment: SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • DocketComplaint and Party Information Entered; Comment: COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONV is a litigant

Latest cases where SIMPLIFIED STAFFING LABOR SOLUTIONS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SIMPLIFIED LABOR STAFFING SOLUTIONS INC. is a litigant