This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/09/2018 at 14:32:07 (UTC).

MURRAY-V-CONTACT SECURITY

Case Summary

On 10/04/2016 MURRAY-V-CONTACT SECURITY was filed as a Labor - Wage Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6546

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wage Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Appellant

CONTACT SECURITY, INC

Respondent

JOHN MURRAY

Other

STATE LABOR COMMISSIONER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorney

LABOR COMMISSIONEROF CALIFORNIA

464 West 4Th Street Room 348

San Bernardino, CA 92401

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

POINTS & AUTHORITIES FILED BY JOHN MURRAY.

POINTS & AUTHORITIES FILED BY JOHN MURRAY.

NOTICE OF REJECTION SENT.

NOTICE OF REJECTION SENT.; Minutes; RESPONDENT MURRAUS REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL IS BEING RETURNED FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON/S: IF PLAINTIFF; IS TRYING TO DISMISS CASE PLAINTIFF MUST DO SO ON CIV-110 REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FORM. IF TRYING TO; MOVE THE COURT VIA MOTION MUST SUBMIT PROPER FORMS AND RESERVE DATES PROPERLY

MOTION RE: RESPONDENT MURRAYS REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL SET FOR HEARING ON 05/25/17, FILED BY DEFENDANT JOHN MURRAY (IMAGED)

MOTION RE: RESPONDENT MURRAYS REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL SET FOR HEARING ON 05/25/17, FILED BY DEFENDANT JOHN MURRAY (IMAGED)

TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete

TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; BARRY L PLOTKIN, JUDGE; CLERK: JENNIFER MEDINA; NOT REPORTED; COURT ATTENDANT C MIRAGLIA; APPEARANCES:; CONTACT SECURITY, INC REPRESENTED BY MICHELLE QUESADA (PRESIDENT).; ATTORNEY EUGENE LEE PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; RESPONDENT JOHN MURRAY PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:14; COURT INDICATES TWO ISSUES WITH THIS MATTER. 1) CONTACT SECURITY INC IS A CORPORATION AND MUST; BE REPRESENTED BY COUNSEL. 2) CONTACT SECURITY INC FAILED TO POST AN UNDERTAKING AS REQUIRED ON; THIS MATTER.; ATTORNEY EUGENE LEE MAKES AN ORAL MOTION TO DISMISS THIS MATTER AS CONTACT SECURITY HAS; FAILED TO POST AN UNDERTAKING AS REQUIRED.; COURT SETS THIS MATTER FOR HEARING ON MOTION.; BRIEFING SCHEDULE AS FOLLOWS:; MURRAYS MOTION TO BE FILED BY 05/01/17`; AND OPPOSITION BY CONTACT SECURITY(W/COUNSEL) NO LATER THAN 05/12/17; ANY REPLY DUE BY 05/18/17.; COURT ORDERS THIS MATTER REFERRED TO LEGAL RESEARCH FOR REVIEW.; HEARINGS:; LAW & MOTION RE: MURRAYS MOTION TO DISMISS/ TRIAL SETTING CONF. SET FOR 05/25/17 AT 10:00 IN DEPT. S17.; (SPECIALLY SET FOR 10:00AM BY COURT); COUNSEL FOR JOHN MURRAY TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE; 09:26; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2017
  • MOTION RE: MURRAYS MOTION TO DISMISS/ TRIAL SETTING CONF.; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • POINTS & AUTHORITIES FILED BY JOHN MURRAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF REJECTION SENT.; Minutes; RESPONDENT MURRAUS REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL IS BEING RETURNED FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON/S: IF PLAINTIFF; IS TRYING TO DISMISS CASE PLAINTIFF MUST DO SO ON CIV-110 REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FORM. IF TRYING TO; MOVE THE COURT VIA MOTION MUST SUBMIT PROPER FORMS AND RESERVE DATES PROPERLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION RE: RESPONDENT MURRAYS REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL SET FOR HEARING ON 05/25/17, FILED BY DEFENDANT JOHN MURRAY (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; BARRY L PLOTKIN, JUDGE; CLERK: JENNIFER MEDINA; NOT REPORTED; COURT ATTENDANT C MIRAGLIA; APPEARANCES:; CONTACT SECURITY, INC REPRESENTED BY MICHELLE QUESADA (PRESIDENT).; ATTORNEY EUGENE LEE PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; RESPONDENT JOHN MURRAY PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:14; COURT INDICATES TWO ISSUES WITH THIS MATTER. 1) CONTACT SECURITY INC IS A CORPORATION AND MUST; BE REPRESENTED BY COUNSEL. 2) CONTACT SECURITY INC FAILED TO POST AN UNDERTAKING AS REQUIRED ON; THIS MATTER.; ATTORNEY EUGENE LEE MAKES AN ORAL MOTION TO DISMISS THIS MATTER AS CONTACT SECURITY HAS; FAILED TO POST AN UNDERTAKING AS REQUIRED.; COURT SETS THIS MATTER FOR HEARING ON MOTION.; BRIEFING SCHEDULE AS FOLLOWS:; MURRAYS MOTION TO BE FILED BY 05/01/17`; AND OPPOSITION BY CONTACT SECURITY(W/COUNSEL) NO LATER THAN 05/12/17; ANY REPLY DUE BY 05/18/17.; COURT ORDERS THIS MATTER REFERRED TO LEGAL RESEARCH FOR REVIEW.; HEARINGS:; LAW & MOTION RE: MURRAYS MOTION TO DISMISS/ TRIAL SETTING CONF. SET FOR 05/25/17 AT 10:00 IN DEPT. S17.; (SPECIALLY SET FOR 10:00AM BY COURT); COUNSEL FOR JOHN MURRAY TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE; 09:26; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • RETURN MAIL: NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE HRG 4/17/17 RECEIVED BACK FROM JOHN MURRAY PER POST OFFICE UNABLE TO FORWARD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE SET ON 4/17/17 AT 8:30 IN S29 - RESCHEDULED TO: IS RESCHEDULED TO AT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE SET ON 4/17/17 AT 8:30 IN S17 IS RESCHEDULED TO AT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY CONTACT SECURITY, INC FOR FILING FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 161004-0540 $240.00; 161004-0540-MC Reference Number 08486Z

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S29

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.