This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/10/2018 at 07:58:21 (UTC).

MURPHY -V- TARGET CORP

Case Summary

On 12/29/2016 MURPHY filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against TARGET CORP. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2345

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARCELOUS MURPHY

Defendant

TARGET CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TAYLOR LABOR LAW, P.C.

572 E. Green Street, Suite 301

Pasadena, CA 91101

Defendant Attorney

MANATT, PHELPS & PHILLIPS

695 Town Center Drive Fourteenth Floor

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY MARCELOUS MURPHY.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY MARCELOUS MURPHY.

ANSWER FILED BY TARGET CORPORATION; PARTY REPRESENTED BY MANATT, PHELPS & PHILLIPS.

ANSWER FILED BY TARGET CORPORATION; PARTY REPRESENTED BY MANATT, PHELPS & PHILLIPS.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS TAYLOR LABOR LAW, P.C. FOR COUNSEL REPRESENTING MARCELOUS MURPHY FILED

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS TAYLOR LABOR LAW, P.C. FOR COUNSEL REPRESENTING MARCELOUS MURPHY FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON TARGET CORPORATION; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 01/23/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON TARGET CORPORATION; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 01/23/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2017
  • HEARING RE: STAY OF REMOVAL; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • HEARING RE: STAY OF REMOVAL; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; JANET M FRANGIE, JUDGE; CLERK: THERESA HANDYSIDE; COURT REPORTER LINDA BALDWIN 12453; COURT ATTENDANT C TURKAL; APPEARANCES:; PARHAM BARKHORDAR APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR MARCELOUS MURPHY.; CHERISE LATORTURE APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR TARGET CORPORATION.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER STILL PENDING IN FEDERAL COURT, THE JUDGE IN FEDERAL COURT IS QUESTIONING JURISDICTION AND; MAY SET AN OSC RE: JURISDICTION BUT TO DATE NOTHING HAS BEEN SET.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 09/26/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S29.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS FILED BY TARGET CORPORATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • STAY OF EXECUTION GRANTED ON CASE. REASON: HIGHER COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • MATTER STAYED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON STATUS OF REMOVAL SENT.; Minutes; PLEASE TAKE NOTICE THAT A HEARING RE: STATUS OF REMOVAL HAS BEEN SET FOR 06/30/17 AT 08:30 IN; DEPT S29. IF YOU HAVE ANY QUESTIONS PLEASE CALL 1 909 708 8678. THANK YOU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT FILED BY TARGET CORPORATION. FEDERAL NUMBER 5:17-CV-00559.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY MARCELOUS MURPHY.

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 02/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS TAYLOR LABOR LAW, P.C. FOR COUNSEL REPRESENTING MARCELOUS MURPHY FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON TARGET CORPORATION; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 01/23/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • PLAINTIFF MARCELOUS MURPHY FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY MARCELOUS MURPHY FOR FILING FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 170106-0121 $435.00; 170106-0121-CK Reference Number 1070

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S29

    Read MoreRead Less