This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/12/2018 at 21:13:42 (UTC).

MTR OF WILLIAM JAMES PIFER

Case Summary

On 06/07/2016 MTR OF WILLIAM JAMES PIFER was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0558

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MARCIA A PIFER

Decedent

WILLIAM JAMES PIFER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ALBREKTSON, KATHLEEN B

1801 Orange Tree Lane Suite 230

Redlands, CA 92374

 

Court Documents

SPOUSAL OR DOMESTIC PARTNER PROPERTY ORDER.

SPOUSAL OR DOMESTIC PARTNER PROPERTY ORDER.

HRG OF 11/01/16 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 11/01/16 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 11/01/16 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 11/01/16 - PROBATE NOTES

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 11/01/16 FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 11/01/16 FILED.

MAILING COVERSHEET 081616 MINUTE ORDER (IMAGED)

MAILING COVERSHEET 081616 MINUTE ORDER (IMAGED)

HRG OF 08/16/16 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 08/16/16 - PROBATE NOTES

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

HRG OF 08/16/16 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 08/16/16 - PROBATE NOTES

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

SPOUSAL/DOMESTIC PARTNER PROPERTY PETITION FILED.

SPOUSAL/DOMESTIC PARTNER PROPERTY PETITION FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY MARCIA A PIFER FOR 1CC OF SPOUSAL PROPERTY ORDER; Minutes; Receipt: 161101-0122 $26.50; 161101-0122-VS Reference Number 031-0000736304

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SPOUSAL OR DOMESTIC PARTNER PROPERTY ORDER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • SPOUSAL PROPERTY PETITION HEARING.; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; WALTER T MOORE, JUDGE PRO TEM; CLERK: ELIZABETH DEATHERAGE; COURT REPORTER KIM HORSTMEYER 11522; COURT ATTENDANT R KRETZMEIER; APPEARANCES:; MARCIA PIFER PRESENT.; ATTORNEY KATHLEEN ALBREKTSON PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); PETITIONERS CHILDREN PRESENT IN COURT HAVE NO OBJECTIONS AND CONSENT TO SPOUSAL PROPERTY; PETITION.; SPOUSAL PROPERTY PETITION FILED 06/07/2016 OF MARCIA PIFER IS GRANTED; ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE.; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION - SPOUSAL PROPERTY PETITION FILED 06/07/2016 OF MARCIA PIFER ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); DISPOSITION ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 11/01/16 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 11/01/16 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2016
  • CASE TRANSFERRED TO NEW DEPARTMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON 11/01/16 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MAILING COVERSHEET 081616 MINUTE ORDER (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2016
  • SPOUSAL PROPERTY PETITION HEARING.; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; CYNTHIA LUDVIGSEN, JUDGE; CLERK: TIFFANY KRETZMEIER; COURT REPORTER CATHY ALBRITTON 7137; COURT ATTENDANT D NEWCOMB; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); PRIOR TO HEARING, COUNSEL MAKES TELEPHONIC REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE TO CLEAR PROBATE NOTES.; EFFECTIVE SEPTEMBER 12, 2016, THIS MATTER WILL BE RESET AND HEARD BY JUDGE REILLY IN DEPARTMENT 37; OF THE SAN BERNARDINO JUSTICE CENTER.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 11/01/16 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S37PP.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL 08/16/16 MINUTE ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 08/16/16 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2016
  • CASE RE-ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT S37PP FOR ALL PURPOSES. NOTICE OF RE-ASSIGNMENT SENT TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 08/16/16 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S36P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2016
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON SPOUSAL PROPERTY RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SPOUSAL/DOMESTIC PARTNER PROPERTY PETITION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2016
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE); Minutes; Receipt: 160607-0713 $465.00; 160607-0713-CK Reference Number 12468

    Read MoreRead Less