This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/13/2018 at 01:59:23 (UTC).

MTR OF WALLACE F ROGERS

Case Summary

On 11/02/2016 MTR OF WALLACE F ROGERS was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1095

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CATHY LYNN EDWARDS

Decedent

WALLACE F ROGERS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

LEHN, RICHARD A

9530 E Imperial Hwy #J

Downey, CA 90242

ARDIS & LEHN

9530 E Imperial Highway #J

Downey, CA 90242

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION AND ORDER FOR FINAL DISCHARGE FILED.

DECLARATION AND ORDER FOR FINAL DISCHARGE FILED.; Minutes; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION - PETITION FOR WILL AND LETTERS TESTAMENTARY FILED 11/02/2016 OF CATHY EDWARDS ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); DISPOSITION ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); CASE COMPLETE

ORDER APPROVING FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF EXECUTOR; PETITION FOR DISTRIBUTION FILED

ORDER APPROVING FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF EXECUTOR; PETITION FOR DISTRIBUTION FILED

HRG OF 09/11/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 09/11/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 09/11/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 09/11/17 - PROBATE NOTES

FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNTING REPORT FILED BY CATHY LYNN EDWARDS

FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNTING REPORT FILED BY CATHY LYNN EDWARDS

NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION TO CREDITORS FILED.

NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION TO CREDITORS FILED.

INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL: FINAL ILED.

INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL: FINAL ILED.

LETTERS ISSUED ( CATHY LYNN EDWARDS EXECUTOR W/LIMITED IAEA)

LETTERS ISSUED ( CATHY LYNN EDWARDS EXECUTOR W/LIMITED IAEA)

ORDER APPOINTING EXECUTOR, CATHY LYNN EDWARDS APPOINTED WITH LIMITED IAEA. BOND NOT REQUIRED, PATRICK B. WRIGHT APPOINTED PROBATE REFEREE, FILED.

ORDER APPOINTING EXECUTOR, CATHY LYNN EDWARDS APPOINTED WITH LIMITED IAEA. BOND NOT REQUIRED, PATRICK B. WRIGHT APPOINTED PROBATE REFEREE, FILED.

HRG OF 01/09/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 01/09/17 - PROBATE NOTES

SUPPLEMENTAL (VERIFIED)TO PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL & FOR LTRS TESTAMENTARY FILED. (IMAGED)

SUPPLEMENTAL (VERIFIED)TO PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL & FOR LTRS TESTAMENTARY FILED. (IMAGED)

HRG OF 01/09/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 01/09/17 - PROBATE NOTES

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY CATHY LYNN EDWARDS

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY CATHY LYNN EDWARDS

PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NTC OF PET TO ADMINSTER 11/12,19,26/16 FILED.

PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NTC OF PET TO ADMINSTER 11/12,19,26/16 FILED.

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY CATHY LYNN EDWARDS

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY CATHY LYNN EDWARDS

RECEIPT FOR WILL LODGED WITH PLACED IN FILE

RECEIPT FOR WILL LODGED WITH PLACED IN FILE

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

PETITION RE: PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY W/LIMITED IAEA FILED.

PETITION RE: PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY W/LIMITED IAEA FILED.

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2018
  • HEARING RE FINAL DISCHARGE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION AND ORDER FOR FINAL DISCHARGE FILED.; Minutes; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION - PETITION FOR WILL AND LETTERS TESTAMENTARY FILED 11/02/2016 OF CATHY EDWARDS ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); DISPOSITION ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); CASE COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER APPROVING FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF EXECUTOR; PETITION FOR DISTRIBUTION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF CATHY LYNN EDWARDS AND PETITION FOR ALLOWANCE OF FEES FILED.; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; JAMES MICHAEL WELCH, JUDGE; CLERK: TRACY MORRIS; COURT REPORTER RHIANNON LEATH-SOUZA 14032; COURT ATTENDANT D NEWCOMB; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY RICHARD A. LEHN PRESENT FOR CATHY LYNN EDWARDS.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); COUNSEL INFORMS THE COURT THAT ALL OF THE BENEFICIARIES OF TRUST AND PETITIONER IN HER; CAPACITY AS SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE WAS FILED. ALL PARTIES WERE LISTED BUT WITHOUT THEIR TITLE.; FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNTING APPROVED/GRANTED.; ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE.; HEARINGS:; HEARING RE FINAL DISCHARGE SET FOR 09/17/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S36P.; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION: SUBSEQUENT PETITION BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); DISPOSITION SUBSEQUENT PETITION BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON 09/11/17 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 09/11/17 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 09/11/17 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 170713-0154 $465.00; 170713-0154-CK Reference Number 7026

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNTING REPORT FILED BY CATHY LYNN EDWARDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION TO CREDITORS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 12/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NTC OF PET TO ADMINSTER 11/12,19,26/16 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2016
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 161207-0790 $2.00; 161207-0790-MC Reference Number 031-0003121383

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 161130-0122 $3.00; 161130-0122-MC Reference Number 031-0002683380

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY CATHY LYNN EDWARDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • ORIGINAL WILL LODGED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT FOR WILL LODGED WITH PLACED IN FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S36P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION RE: PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY W/LIMITED IAEA FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE); Minutes; Receipt: 161102-0065 $465.00; 161102-0065-CK Reference Number 6667

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.