This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/11/2018 at 18:05:39 (UTC).

MTR OF VIOLA ARAMBULA

Case Summary

On 05/12/2017 MTR OF VIOLA ARAMBULA was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0457

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Not Classified By Court

IRENE LOPEZ

THOMAS ARAMBULA

Decedent

VIOLA ARAMBULA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Not Classified By Court Attorneys

ROTH, MITCHELL I

10535 Foothill Blvd #300

Rancho Cucamonga, CA 91730

LAW OFFICES OF DOONAN & DOONAN, INC

627 W. Allen Avenue Ste 200

San Dimas, CA 91773-1447

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY IRENE LOPEZ

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY IRENE LOPEZ

RECEIPT FOR WILL LODGED WITH COURT PLACED IN FILE

RECEIPT FOR WILL LODGED WITH COURT PLACED IN FILE

RECEIPT FOR WILL LODGED WITH COURT PLACED IN FILE

RECEIPT FOR WILL LODGED WITH COURT PLACED IN FILE

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY IRENE LOPEZ

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY IRENE LOPEZ

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY IRENE LOPEZ

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY IRENE LOPEZ

PETITION RE: PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY W/FULL IAEA FILED.

PETITION RE: PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY W/FULL IAEA FILED.

PETITION RE: PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY W/FULL IAEA FILED.

PETITION RE: PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY W/FULL IAEA FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2018
  • PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY W/FULL IAEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • HEARING RE: CONFIRMATION OF SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • PETITION FOR CONTESTING THE LAST WILL OF VIOLA ARAMBULA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • RESPONSE BY IRENE LOPEZ TO PET. CONTESTING THE LAST WILL OF VIOLA ARAMBULA FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY IRENE LOPEZ FOR RESPONSE TO WILL CONTEST; Minutes; Receipt: 180710-0282 $435.00; 180710-0282-CK Reference Number 3981

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY W/FULL IAEA; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; TARA REILLY, JUDGE; CLERK: ELIZABETH DEATHERAGE; COURT REPORTER KIM HORSTMEYER 11522; COURT ATTENDANT R KRETZMEIER; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY MITCHELL ROTH PRESENT FOR IRENE LOPEZ.; ATTORNEY D SCOTT DOONAN PRESENT FOR THOMAS ARAMBULA.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); THE COURT APPOINTS IRENE LOPEZ AS SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR FOR THE SOLE PURPOSE OF LISTING; AND SELLING THE REAL PROPERTY. THE LISTING AGENT AND THE SALE PRICE OF THE HOME MUST BE APPROVED; BY ALL FIVE SIBLINGS. THE NET PROCEEDS FROM THE SALE OF THE HOME ARE TO BE HELD IN MR. ROTHS; TRUST ACCOUNT PENDING FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT.; NO BOND IS REQUIRED.; MR. ROTH TO PREPARE ORDERS AND LETTERS.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 10/23/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S37P.; HEARING RE: CONFIRMATION OF SALE SET FOR 10/23/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S37P.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • PETITION FOR CONTESTING THE LAST WILL OF VIOLA ARAMBULA; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; TARA REILLY, JUDGE; CLERK: ELIZABETH DEATHERAGE; COURT REPORTER KIM HORSTMEYER 11522; COURT ATTENDANT R KRETZMEIER; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY MITCHELL ROTH PRESENT FOR IRENE LOPEZ.; ATTORNEY D SCOTT DOONAN PRESENT FOR THOMAS ARAMBULA.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); SEE OTHER MINUTES THIS DATE.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 10/23/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S37P.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY W/FULL IAEA; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; TARA REILLY, JUDGE; CLERK: ELIZABETH DEATHERAGE; COURT REPORTER KIM HORSTMEYER 11522; COURT ATTENDANT R KRETZMEIER; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY MITCHELL ROTH MAKES A TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE; THOMAS ARABULA PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); COUNSEL REQUESTS MATTER BE TRAILED ONE DAY AS HE NEEDS TO ATTEND AN EMERGENCY HEARING IN LOS; ANGELES.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 07/10/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S37A.; NOTICE TO BE GIVEN BY MR. ROTH.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • PETITION FOR CONTESTING THE LAST WILL OF VIOLA ARAMBULA; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; TARA REILLY, JUDGE; CLERK: ELIZABETH DEATHERAGE; COURT REPORTER KIM HORSTMEYER 11522; COURT ATTENDANT R KRETZMEIER; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY MITHCELL ROTH MAKES A TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE; THOMAS ARAMBULA PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); SEE OTHER MINUTES THIS DATE.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 07/10/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S37A.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • HRG OF 07/09/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 05/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY IRENE LOPEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT FOR WILL LODGED WITH COURT PLACED IN FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • ORIGINAL WILL LODGED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • PROPOSED LETTERS RECEIVED (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON LTRS TESTAMENTARY W/FULL IAEA BOND NOT RQURD RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • CONFIDENTIAL STATEMENT OF BIRTH DATE AND DRIVER'S LICENSE NUMBER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY IRENE LOPEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION RE: PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY W/FULL IAEA FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE); Minutes; Receipt: 170512-0115 $465.00; 170512-0115-CK Reference Number 3877

    Read MoreRead Less