This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/12/2018 at 18:32:05 (UTC).

MTR OF VINCENT MEDINA PADILLA

Case Summary

On 11/08/2016 MTR OF VINCENT MEDINA PADILLA was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0327

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner, Not Classified By Court and Conservator

JOHN MICHAEL PADILLA

Conservatee

VINCENT MEDINA PADILLA

 

Court Documents

HRG OF 01/05/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 01/05/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 01/05/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 01/05/17 - PROBATE NOTES

ORDER APPOINTING COURT INVESTIGATOR FILED.

ORDER APPOINTING COURT INVESTIGATOR FILED.

PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF TEMPORARY CONSERVATOR FILED BY JOHN MICHAEL PADILLA

PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF TEMPORARY CONSERVATOR FILED BY JOHN MICHAEL PADILLA

NOTIFICATION TO COURT OF ADDRESS OF CONSERVATORSHIP FILED

NOTIFICATION TO COURT OF ADDRESS OF CONSERVATORSHIP FILED

DUTIES OF CONSERVATOR AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT OF HANDBOOK FILED.

DUTIES OF CONSERVATOR AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT OF HANDBOOK FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

PETITION FOR EXCLUSIVE AUTH TO GIVE CONSENT FOR MEDICAL FILED BY JOHN MICHAEL PADILLA(PROBATE).

PETITION FOR EXCLUSIVE AUTH TO GIVE CONSENT FOR MEDICAL FILED BY JOHN MICHAEL PADILLA(PROBATE).

PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF CONSERVATOR OF THE PERSON AND ESTATE FILED.

PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF CONSERVATOR OF THE PERSON AND ESTATE FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2017
  • PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF CONSERVATOR; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; TARA REILLY, JUDGE; CLERK: ELIZABETH DEATHERAGE; COURT REPORTER KIM HORSTMEYER 11522; COURT ATTENDANT R KRETZMEIER; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); COURT INVESTIGATOR'S REPORT FILED.; PROPOSED CONSERVATEE HAS PASSED AWAY.; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); DISPOSITION ENTRY COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION: SUBSEQUENT PETITION BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); DISPOSITION SUBSEQUENT PETITION BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • PETITION FOR EXCLUSIVE AUTHORITY TO GIVE CONSENT FOR MEDICAL TREATMENT; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; TARA REILLY, JUDGE; CLERK: ELIZABETH DEATHERAGE; COURT REPORTER KIM HORSTMEYER 11522; COURT ATTENDANT R KRETZMEIER; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); PROPOSED CONSERVATEE HAS PASSED AWAY.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 01/05/17 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • REPORT OF NO REPORT BY COURT INVESTIGATOR FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 01/05/17 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER APPOINTING COURT INVESTIGATOR FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF TEMPORARY CONSERVATOR; Disposition: Off Calendar; Minutes; TARA REILLY, JUDGE; CLERK: ELIZABETH DEATHERAGE; COURT REPORTER KIM HORSTMEYER 11522; COURT ATTENDANT R KRETZMEIER; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); 09:45; OFF-CALENDAR. REASON: NON-APPEARANCE OF PARTIES; HEARINGS:; HEARING DATE OF 01/05/17 CONFIRMED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2016
  • UPDATE COMPLAINT OF PETITION FOR CONSERVATORSHIP FILED 11/08/2016 OF JOHN PADILLA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2016
  • CI CASE FACESHEE T PLACED IN FILE - CONFIDENTIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON AUTHORIZING CONSERVATR TO GIVE CONSENT RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 11/08/2016
  • CONFIDENTIAL SUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • LIST OF REQUIRED CONTACT INFORMATION FOR CONSERVATORSHIPS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • SUPPLEMENTAL PETITION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • CAPACITY DECLARATION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION FOR EXCLUSIVE AUTH TO GIVE CONSENT FOR MEDICAL FILED BY JOHN MICHAEL PADILLA(PROBATE).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • CITATION ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF CONSERVATOR OF THE PERSON AND ESTATE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY JOHN MICHAEL PADILLA FOR PTN FOR APPT OF TEMP CONSERVTRSHIP; Minutes; Receipt: 161109-0352 $90.00; 161109-0352-CS Reference Number 1599511460

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (CONSERVATORSHIP); Minutes; Receipt: 161109-0238 $465.00; 161109-0238-CK Reference Number 1599511460

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.