This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/11/2018 at 22:12:55 (UTC).

MTR OF VINCENT MEDINA PADILLA

Case Summary

On 10/30/2017 MTR OF VINCENT MEDINA PADILLA was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1082

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

JOHN MICHAEL PADILLA

TANYA EVANS

Decedent

VINCENT MEDINA PADILLA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ALYSSA C WESTOVER A PROFESSIONAL LAW CORP

3450 E Spring Street Suite 107

Long Beach, CA 90806

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: APPOINTMENT OF JUDGE PRO TEMPORE FILED.

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: APPOINTMENT OF JUDGE PRO TEMPORE FILED.

HRG OF 02/15/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 02/15/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 02/15/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 02/15/18 - PROBATE NOTES

RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR PROBATE & REQUEST FOR ORDER POSTING BOND FILED.

RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR PROBATE & REQUEST FOR ORDER POSTING BOND FILED.

CREDITORS CLAIM FILED BY JOHN M PADILLA. TOTAL AMOUNT OF CLAIM IS $100,900.00.

CREDITORS CLAIM FILED BY JOHN M PADILLA. TOTAL AMOUNT OF CLAIM IS $100,900.00.

CREDITORS CLAIM FILED BY TANYA EVANS. TOTAL AMOUNT OF CLAIM IS $66,497.01.

CREDITORS CLAIM FILED BY TANYA EVANS. TOTAL AMOUNT OF CLAIM IS $66,497.01.

EX PARTE APPLICATION FORORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL ADMINSITRA FILED.

EX PARTE APPLICATION FORORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL ADMINSITRA FILED.

JOHN MICHAEL PADILLAS CONSENT TO ACT AS SPECIALA DMINISTRATOR FILED.

JOHN MICHAEL PADILLAS CONSENT TO ACT AS SPECIALA DMINISTRATOR FILED.

PETITION SPECIAL ADMINISTRATION WITH GENERAL POWERS FILED BY TANYA EVANS(PROBATE).

PETITION SPECIAL ADMINISTRATION WITH GENERAL POWERS FILED BY TANYA EVANS(PROBATE).

PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION FILED.

PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION FILED.

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED.

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED.

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY JOHN MICHAEL PADILLA

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY JOHN MICHAEL PADILLA

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

PETITION RE: PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION W/FULL IAEA FILED.

PETITION RE: PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION W/FULL IAEA FILED.

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: APPOINTMENT OF JUDGE PRO TEMPORE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • HEARING RE: PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMIN. W/ FULL AUTHORITY UNDER IAEA.; Disposition: Off Calendar; Minutes; MITCHELL IRA ROTH, JUDGE PRO TEM; CLERK: ILAYALI WADE; COURT REPORTER LINDY CASTRO 13180; COURT ATTENDANT D MORENO; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY THOMAS DOMINICK PRESENT FOR VINCENT MEDINA PADILLA.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); PARTIES ADVISED RE:COMMISSIONER/ATTORNEY PRO TEM; NO OBJECTION RAISED. FAILURE TO OBJECT IS DEEMED A STIPULATION TO COMMISSIONER/ATTORNEY PRO TEM SITTING AS JUDGE PRO TEM.; OFF-CALENDAR. REASON: PURSUANT TO ORDER OF THE COURT: PETITION IS MOOT.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 02/15/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 02/15/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR PROBATE & REQUEST FOR ORDER POSTING BOND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 171227-0264 $435.00; 171227-0264-CK Reference Number D3581201

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CREDITORS CLAIM FILED BY JOHN M PADILLA. TOTAL AMOUNT OF CLAIM IS $100,900.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CREDITORS CLAIM FILED BY TANYA EVANS. TOTAL AMOUNT OF CLAIM IS $66,497.01.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • EX PARTE HEARING RE: APPLICATION FOR ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; STANFORD E. REICHERT, JUDGE; CLERK: TIFFANY KRETZMEIER; COURT REPORTER LINDY CASTRO 13180; COURT ATTENDANT D MORENO; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY ALYSSA WESTOVER PRESENT FOR JOHN PADILLA & TANYA EVANS, JOHN PADILLA PRESENT.; ATTORNEY MARK MCGUIRE PRESENT FOR VINCENT J PADILLA.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); EX-PARTE HEARING IS HELD.; EX PARTE APPLICATION ARGUED.; EX PARTE ORDERS DENIED; MARK MCGUIRE INDICATES HIS CLIENT HAS ALREADY FILED A PETITION- WHICH IS SET FOR HEARING IN; S36 ON JANUARY 3, 2018: PROPS1700976.; HEARINGS:; HEARING DATE OF 02/15/18 CONFIRMED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMINISTRATION WITH GENRAL POWERS; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; STANFORD E. REICHERT, JUDGE; CLERK: TIFFANY KRETZMEIER; COURT REPORTER LINDY CASTRO 13180; COURT ATTENDANT D MORENO; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY ALYSSA WESTOVER PRESENT FOR JOHN PADILLA & TANYA EVANS, JOHN PADILLA PRESENT.; ATTORNEY MARK MCGUIRE PRESENT FOR VINCENT J PADILLA.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); EX-PARTE HEARING IS HELD.; EX PARTE APPLICATION ARGUED.; EX PARTE ORDERS DENIED; MARK MCGUIRE INDICATES HIS CLIENT HAS ALREADY FILED A PETITION- WHICH IS SET FOR HEARING IN; S36 ON JANUARY 3, 2018: PROPS1700976.; HEARINGS:; HEARING DATE OF 02/15/18 CONFIRMED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 12/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION SPECIAL ADMINISTRATION WITH GENERAL POWERS FILED BY TANYA EVANS(PROBATE).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY JOHN MICHAEL PADILLA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • CONFIDENTIAL STATEMENT OF BIRTH DATE AND DRIVER'S LICENSE NUMBER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON APPOINTING ADMINISTRATOR RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION RE: PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION W/FULL IAEA FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S35P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE); Minutes; Receipt: 171030-0909 $465.00; 171030-0909-CK Reference Number 3584152

    Read MoreRead Less