This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/13/2018 at 03:33:56 (UTC).

MTR OF TONI HYATT

Case Summary

On 12/14/2016 MTR OF TONI HYATT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1237

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

SHARON JOHNSON

LISA HYATT

Decedent

TONI HYATT

Not Classified By Court

SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY

Other

STATE OF CA FRANCHISE TAX BOARD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

THOMAS V PRATT

8560 Vineyard Ave Suite 108

Rancho Cucamonga, CA 91730

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION FILED.

SURETY BOND ISSUED LISA HYATT IN THE AMT OF 25,000.00 BY SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY FILED.

SURETY BOND ISSUED LISA HYATT IN THE AMT OF 25,000.00 BY SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY FILED.

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: APPOINTMENT OF JUDGE PRO TEMPORE FILED.

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: APPOINTMENT OF JUDGE PRO TEMPORE FILED.

ALLOWANCE OF CREDITOR'S CLAIM OF PHILLIPS & COHEN AND ASSOCIATES, LTD O/B/O CITIBAN IN THE AMOUNT OF $3,039.82 FILED.

ALLOWANCE OF CREDITOR'S CLAIM OF PHILLIPS & COHEN AND ASSOCIATES, LTD O/B/O CITIBAN IN THE AMOUNT OF $3,039.82 FILED.

CREDITORS CLAIM FILED BY DISCOVER BANK. TOTAL AMOUNT OF CLAIM IS $4,541.81.

CREDITORS CLAIM FILED BY DISCOVER BANK. TOTAL AMOUNT OF CLAIM IS $4,541.81.

CREDITORS CLAIM FILED BY CITIBANK, NA. TOTAL AMOUNT OF CLAIM IS $3,039.82.

CREDITORS CLAIM FILED BY CITIBANK, NA. TOTAL AMOUNT OF CLAIM IS $3,039.82.

WITHDRAWAL OF REQUEST FOR SPECIAL NOTICE BY STATE OF CALIFORNIA FRANCHISE TAX BOARD FILED.

WITHDRAWAL OF REQUEST FOR SPECIAL NOTICE BY STATE OF CALIFORNIA FRANCHISE TAX BOARD FILED.

INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL: FINAL ILED.

INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL: FINAL ILED.

LETTERS ISSUED ( ADMINISTRATION)

LETTERS ISSUED ( ADMINISTRATION)

ALLOWANCE OF CREDITOR'S CLAIM OF STATE OF CALIFORNIA, FRANCHISE TAX BOARD IN THE AMOUNT OF $250.81 FILED.

ALLOWANCE OF CREDITOR'S CLAIM OF STATE OF CALIFORNIA, FRANCHISE TAX BOARD IN THE AMOUNT OF $250.81 FILED.

SATISFACTION OF CREDITORS CLAIM FILED.

SATISFACTION OF CREDITORS CLAIM FILED.

PETITION FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION ON WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING REPORT FILED BY LISA HYATT, SHARON JOHNSON

PETITION FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION ON WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING REPORT FILED BY LISA HYATT, SHARON JOHNSON

HRG OF 03/13/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 03/13/18 - PROBATE NOTES

PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED.

PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED.

HRG OF 03/13/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 03/13/18 - PROBATE NOTES

INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL: FINAL ILED.

INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL: FINAL ILED.

HRG OF 02/22/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 02/22/17 - PROBATE NOTES

DECLARATION AND ORDER FOR FINAL DISCHARGE FILED.

DECLARATION AND ORDER FOR FINAL DISCHARGE FILED.; Minutes; ACTION - COMPLETE; CASE CLOSED.

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2019
  • HEARING RE FINAL DISCHARGE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION AND ORDER FOR FINAL DISCHARGE FILED.; Minutes; ACTION - COMPLETE; CASE CLOSED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON EXPARTE PETITION FOR FINAL DISCHARGE AND ORDER RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT RE: STATUTORY ATTORNEYS FEES BY THOMAS V PRATT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • ACCOUNTING REVIEW BY; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY LISA HYATT FOR FAX; Minutes; Receipt: 180314-0652 $2.00; 180314-0652-MC Reference Number 031-0094556826

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: APPOINTMENT OF JUDGE PRO TEMPORE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER DECREE OF FINAL DISTRIBUTION ON WAIVER OF ACCOUNT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • PETITION FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION ON WAIVER OF ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF LISA HYATT, SHARON JOHNSON AND PETITION FOR ALLOWANCE OF FEES FILED.; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; WALTER T MOORE, JUDGE PRO TEM; CLERK: ELIZABETH DEATHERAGE; COURT REPORTER KIM HORSTMEYER 11522; COURT ATTENDANT R KRETZMEIER; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY THOMAS PRATT PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; PROCEEDINGS:; STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: APPOINTMENT OF JUDGE PRO TEM FILED.; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); THE COURT REVIEWS SUPPLEMENT FAX FILED AND NOT YET PROCESSED BY THE COURT.; PTN FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION ON WVR OF ACCOUNTING APPROVED/GRANTED.; ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE.; HEARINGS:; HEARING RE FINAL DISCHARGE SET FOR 03/19/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S37P.; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION: SUBSEQUENT PETITION BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); DISPOSITION SUBSEQUENT PETITION BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUPPLEMENTAL TO PETITION FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION ON WAIVER OF AC COUNT FILED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 01/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY LISA HYATT, SHARON JOHNSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • PROPOSED LETTERS RECEIVED (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • CONFIDENTIAL STATEMENT OF BIRTH DATE AND DRIVER'S LICENSE NUMBER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY LISA HYATT, SHARON JOHNSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON APPTING ADMINISTRATOR RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • CONFIDENTIAL STATEMENT OF BIRTH DATE AND DRIVER'S LICENSE NUMBER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S37P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION RE: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION W/FULL IAEA FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE); Minutes; Receipt: 161214-0299 $465.00; 161214-0299-CK Reference Number 1710

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.