This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/11/2018 at 21:11:59 (UTC).

MTR OF THOMAS ALVIN ATKINSON

Case Summary

On 09/07/2017 MTR OF THOMAS ALVIN ATKINSON was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0892

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LYNETTE ATKINSON RAMIREZ

Decedent

THOMAS ALVIN ATKINSON

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NTC. OF PET. TO ADMINISTER 10/17, 10/24, 10/31/17 FILED.

PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NTC. OF PET. TO ADMINISTER 10/17, 10/24, 10/31/17 FILED.

PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NTC. OF PET. TO ADMINISTER 10/17, 10/24, 10/31/17 FILED.

PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NTC. OF PET. TO ADMINISTER 10/17, 10/24, 10/31/17 FILED.

CREDITORS CLAIM FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS. TOTAL AMOUNT OF CLAIM IS $728.32.

CREDITORS CLAIM FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS. TOTAL AMOUNT OF CLAIM IS $728.32.

ORDER APPOINTING EXECUTOR, LYNETTE ATKINSON RAMIREZ APPOINTED WITH FULL IAEA. BOND NOT REQ, PATRICK WRIGHT APPOINTED PROBATE REFEREE, FILED.

ORDER APPOINTING EXECUTOR, LYNETTE ATKINSON RAMIREZ APPOINTED WITH FULL IAEA. BOND NOT REQ, PATRICK WRIGHT APPOINTED PROBATE REFEREE, FILED.

LETTERS ISSUED ( TESTAMENTARY)

LETTERS ISSUED ( TESTAMENTARY)

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY LYNETTE ATKINSON RAMIREZ

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY LYNETTE ATKINSON RAMIREZ

WAIVER OF BOND BY HEIR CLAUDIA M. ATKINSON FILED.

WAIVER OF BOND BY HEIR CLAUDIA M. ATKINSON FILED.

HRG OF 01/11/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 01/11/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 01/11/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 01/11/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 12/19/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 12/19/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 12/19/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 12/19/17 - PROBATE NOTES

AMENDED PET FOR PROBATE OF WILL & FOR LTRS TESTAMETARY W/FULL IAEA FILED.

AMENDED PET FOR PROBATE OF WILL & FOR LTRS TESTAMETARY W/FULL IAEA FILED.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

WAIVER OF BOND BY HEIR OR BENEFICIARY FILED.

WAIVER OF BOND BY HEIR OR BENEFICIARY FILED.

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY LYNETTE ATKINSON RAMIREZ

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY LYNETTE ATKINSON RAMIREZ

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

COPY OF RECEIPT FOR WILL LODGED WITH THE COURT PLACED IN FILE

COPY OF RECEIPT FOR WILL LODGED WITH THE COURT PLACED IN FILE

PETITION RE: PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY FILED.

PETITION RE: PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY FILED.

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2019
  • ACCOUNTING REVIEW BY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • CREDITORS CLAIM FILED BY JMD, A CALIFORNIA LLC, DBA: HIGH DESERT ETC. TOTAL AMOUNT OF CLAIM IS $1,397.72.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION TO CREDITORS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • REJECTION OF CREDITOR'S CLAIM OF JMD A CALIFORNIA LLC, BBA HIGH DESERT ETC FILED ON NOT FILED IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,397.72 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • ALLOWANCE OR REJECTION OF CREDITORS CLAIM IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): PLEASE SEE ATTACHED DOCUMENT FROM CLERK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL: FINAL ILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION TO CREDITORS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • CREDITORS CLAIM FILED BY JMD, A CALIFORNIA LLC, DBA:HIGH DESERT ETC. TOTAL AMOUNT OF CLAIM IS $1,397.72.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION TO CREDITORS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 09/07/2017
  • CONFIDENTIAL STATEMENT OF BIRTH DATE AND DRIVER'S LICENSE NUMBER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY LYNETTE ATKINSON RAMIREZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY LYNETTE ATKINSON RAMIREZ IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON LYNETTE ATKINSON RAMIREZ FOR NEW PETITION IN THE AMOUNT OF $465.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COPY OF RECEIPT FOR WILL LODGED WITH THE COURT PLACED IN FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION RE: PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON APPOINTING EXECUTOR RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S35P

    Read MoreRead Less