This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/11/2018 at 13:21:56 (UTC).

MTR OF TERESA FLORES

Case Summary

On 02/09/2017 MTR OF TERESA FLORES was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0130

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ANDREW FLORES

Decedent

TERESA FLORES

Other

DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH CARE SERIVCES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SCHUMATE, CHRISTOPHER A

1801 Orange Tree Lane Suite 230

Redlands, CA 92374

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

PETITION RE: PROBATE OF WILL & FOR LTRS TESTAMENTARY W/ FULL IAEA FILED.

PETITION RE: PROBATE OF WILL & FOR LTRS TESTAMENTARY W/ FULL IAEA FILED.

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY ANDREW FLORES

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY ANDREW FLORES

PETITION RE: PROBATE OF WILL & FOR LTRS TESTAMENTARY W/ FULL IAEA FILED.

PETITION RE: PROBATE OF WILL & FOR LTRS TESTAMENTARY W/ FULL IAEA FILED.

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY ANDREW FLORES

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY ANDREW FLORES

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

RCPT FOR WILL LODGED WITH COURT PLACED IN FILE

RCPT FOR WILL LODGED WITH COURT PLACED IN FILE

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2019
  • HEARING RE FINAL DISCHARGE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • ACCOUNTING REVIEW BY; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • DECLARATION AND ORDER FOR FINAL DISCHARGE FILED.; Minutes; CASE COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON EXPARTE PTN FOR FINAL DISCHARGE AND ORDR RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • RECEIPT RE: OF DISTRIBUTIVE SHARE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • RECEIPT RE: DISTRIBUTIVE SHARE, TERRENCE CHRISTOPHER FLORES FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • RECEIPT RE: DISTRIBUTIVE SHARE, ANDREW FLORES FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • RECEIPT RE: FOR FEES BY CHRISTOPHER A. SHUMATE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ANDREW FLORES FOR 1 CC ORDER SETTLING FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT; Minutes; Receipt: 180131-0171 $27.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • ORDER SETTLING FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNTING AND REPORT OF EXECUTOR FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 02/23/2017
  • NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY ANDREW FLORES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • RCPT FOR WILL LODGED WITH COURT PLACED IN FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • PROPOSED LETTERS RECEIVED (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON APPOINTING EXECUTOR RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S35P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY ANDREW FLORES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • CONFIDENTIAL STATEMENT OF BIRTH DATE AND DRIVER'S LICENSE NUMBER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION RE: PROBATE OF WILL & FOR LTRS TESTAMENTARY W/ FULL IAEA FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE); Minutes; Receipt: 170209-0557 $465.00; 170209-0557-CK Reference Number 13330

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.