This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/13/2018 at 01:03:11 (UTC).

MTR OF TAMARA KAY HANSON

Case Summary

On 10/05/2016 MTR OF TAMARA KAY HANSON was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0995

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CRAIG A HANSON

Decedent

TAMARA KAY HANSON

Other

JULIET KANE

Not Classified By Court

SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Other Attorney

BUXBAUM & CHAKMAK

414 Yale Avenue Suite K

Claremont, CA 91711-4387

 

Court Documents

PETITION RE: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION W/FULL IAEA FILED.

PETITION RE: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION W/FULL IAEA FILED.

PETITION RE: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION W/FULL IAEA FILED.

PETITION RE: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION W/FULL IAEA FILED.

HRG OF 09/06/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 09/06/18 - PROBATE NOTES

RETURN ON REQUEST FOR SERVICE OF CITATION PLACED IN FILE

RETURN ON REQUEST FOR SERVICE OF CITATION PLACED IN FILE

WAIVER OF ACCOUNT FILED.

WAIVER OF ACCOUNT FILED.

PETITION FOR SETTLEMENT OF FIRST ACCOUNTING REPORT FILED BY CRAIG A HANSON

PETITION FOR SETTLEMENT OF FIRST ACCOUNTING REPORT FILED BY CRAIG A HANSON

HRG OF 07/31/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 07/31/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 04/17/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 04/17/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 04/17/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 04/17/18 - PROBATE NOTES

CREDITORS CLAIM FILED BY R.M. GALICIA INC DBA PROGRESSIVE MANAGEMENT SYSTMS. TOTAL AMOUNT OF CLAIM IS $57,576.35.

CREDITORS CLAIM FILED BY R.M. GALICIA INC DBA PROGRESSIVE MANAGEMENT SYSTMS. TOTAL AMOUNT OF CLAIM IS $57,576.35.

HRG OF 03/07/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 03/07/17 - PROBATE NOTES

LETTERS ISSUED ( ADMINISTRATION)

LETTERS ISSUED ( ADMINISTRATION)

ORDER APPOINTING ADMINISTRATOR, CRAIG A. HANSON APPOINTED WITH FULL IAEA. BOND $100,000.00, B.M. GARVIN APPOINTED PROBATE REFEREE, FILED.

ORDER APPOINTING ADMINISTRATOR, CRAIG A. HANSON APPOINTED WITH FULL IAEA. BOND $100,000.00, B.M. GARVIN APPOINTED PROBATE REFEREE, FILED.

SUPPLEMENTAL TO PETITION FOR PROBATE FILED. (IMAGED)

SUPPLEMENTAL TO PETITION FOR PROBATE FILED. (IMAGED)

HRG OF 02/07/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 02/07/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 02/07/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 02/07/17 - PROBATE NOTES

PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED.

PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED.

HRG OF 11/22/16 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 11/22/16 - PROBATE NOTES

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2018
  • PETITION FOR SETTLEMENT OF FIRST ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF CRAIG A HANSON AND PETITION FOR ALLOWANCE OF FEES FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MAILING COVERSHEET FOR MINUTE ORDER DATED 09/06/18 PLACED IN FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • PETITION FOR SETTLEMENT OF FIRST ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF CRAIG A HANSON AND PETITION FOR ALLOWANCE OF FEES FILED.; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; JAMES MICHAEL WELCH, JUDGE; CLERK: RACHELE ANDREWS; COURT REPORTER CATHY ALBRITTON 7137; COURT ATTENDANT D NEWCOMB; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF COURT.; REASON: NON APPEARANCE AND PROBATE NOTES TO BE CLEARED.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 10/11/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S36P.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL 09/06/18 MINUTE ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 09/06/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 09/06/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • ACCOUNTING REVIEW BY; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN ON REQUEST FOR SERVICE OF CITATION PLACED IN FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CREDITOR BEN SCOTT FOSTER JR SATISFACTION OF ITS CREDITORS CLAIM FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • WAIVER OF ACCOUNT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION FOR SETTLEMENT OF FIRST ACCOUNTING REPORT FILED BY CRAIG A HANSON

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 11/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 11/22/16 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 11/22/16 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY CRAIG A HANSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON APPLICATION & ORDR APPOINTING PROBATE REFEREE RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S36P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON APPOINTING ADMINISTRATOR RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • PROPOSED LETTERS RECEIVED (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION RE: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION W/FULL IAEA FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE); Minutes; Receipt: 161005-0517 $465.00; 161005-0517-CK Reference Number 2746

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.