This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/13/2018 at 00:57:11 (UTC).

MTR OF SONJA R DOUGLASS

Case Summary

On 10/03/2016 MTR OF SONJA R DOUGLASS was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0984

  • Filing Date:

    10/03/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DENNIS P DOUGLASS

Decedent

SONJA R DOUGLASS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

DEBORAH A MALKIN

2425 Porter Street Suite 3

Soquel, CA 95073

 

Court Documents

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF DISTRIBUTION/DENNIS P DOUGLASS FILED.

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF DISTRIBUTION/DENNIS P DOUGLASS FILED.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

ORDER JUDGMENT APPROVING & SETTLING FIRST & FINAL ACCOUNT FILED

ORDER JUDGMENT APPROVING & SETTLING FIRST & FINAL ACCOUNT FILED

SUPPLEMENTAL RE FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT AND PETITION FILED. (IMAGED)

SUPPLEMENTAL RE FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT AND PETITION FILED. (IMAGED)

HRG OF 08/29/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 08/29/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 08/29/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 08/29/17 - PROBATE NOTES

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 082817 FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 082817 FILED.

INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL: SUPPLEMENTAL ILED.

INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL: SUPPLEMENTAL ILED.

FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNTING REPORT FILED BY DENNIS P DOUGLASS

FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNTING REPORT FILED BY DENNIS P DOUGLASS

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 08/29/17 W/POS FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 08/29/17 W/POS FILED.

INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL: FINAL ILED.

INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL: FINAL ILED.

INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL: FINAL ILED.

INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL: FINAL ILED.

ORDER APPOINTING ADMINISTRATOR, DENNIS P. DOUGLASS APPOINTED WITH FULL IAEA. BOND NOT REQUIRED, B.M. GARVIN APPOINTED PROBATE REFEREE, FILED.

ORDER APPOINTING ADMINISTRATOR, DENNIS P. DOUGLASS APPOINTED WITH FULL IAEA. BOND NOT REQUIRED, B.M. GARVIN APPOINTED PROBATE REFEREE, FILED.

HRG OF 11/28/16 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 11/28/16 - PROBATE NOTES

PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NTC OF PET TO ADMINISTR 10/27,31/16 11/03/16 FILED.

PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NTC OF PET TO ADMINISTR 10/27,31/16 11/03/16 FILED.

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY DENNIS P DOUGLASS

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY DENNIS P DOUGLASS

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY DENNIS P DOUGLASS

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY DENNIS P DOUGLASS

PETITION RE: LETTERS OF ADMIN W/ FULL AUTH TO ADMIN UNDER THE IAEA FILED.

PETITION RE: LETTERS OF ADMIN W/ FULL AUTH TO ADMIN UNDER THE IAEA FILED.

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2018
  • HEARING RE FINAL DISCHARGE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • ACCOUNTING REVIEW; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION AND ORDER FOR FINAL DISCHARGE FILED.; Minutes; ACTION - COMPLETE; CASE CLOSED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON EX PARTE PETITION FOR FINAL DISCHARGE AND ORDER RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF DISTRIBUTION/DENNIS P DOUGLASS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • JUDGMENT APPROVING & SETTLING FIRST & FINAL IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): SEE ATTACHED RETURN SLIP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER JUDGMENT APPROVING & SETTLING FIRST & FINAL ACCOUNT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON JUDGEMENT APPROVING & SETTLING FIRST & FINAL RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF DENNIS P DOUGLASS AND PETITION FOR ALLOWANCE OF FEES FILED.; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; JAMES MICHAEL WELCH, JUDGE; CLERK: RACHELE ANDREWS; COURT REPORTER CATHY ALBRITTON 7137; COURT ATTENDANT D RICE; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY DEBORAH MALKIN APPEARS BY COURT CALL.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); PROBATE NOTES ARE CLEARED ON THE RECORD.; FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNTING APPROVED/GRANTED.; COUNSEL TO SUBMIT ORDER.; HEARINGS:; HEARING RE FINAL DISCHARGE SET FOR 09/04/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S36P.; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION: SUBSEQUENT PETITION BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); DISPOSITION SUBSEQUENT PETITION BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 11/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 11/28/16 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 11/28/16 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NTC OF PET TO ADMINISTR 10/27,31/16 11/03/16 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY DENNIS P DOUGLASS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2016
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON OF LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY DENNIS P DOUGLASS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2016
  • CONFIDENTIAL STATEMENT OF BIRTH DATE AND DRIVER'S LICENSE NUMBER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S36P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION RE: LETTERS OF ADMIN W/ FULL AUTH TO ADMIN UNDER THE IAEA FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2016
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE); Minutes; Receipt: 161004-0420 $465.00; 161004-0420-CK Reference Number 7544

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.