This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/11/2018 at 16:10:37 (UTC).

MTR OF SHARON ADELE JEGLIN

Case Summary

On 09/14/2017 MTR OF SHARON ADELE JEGLIN was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0343

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court and Conservators

MARVIN H JEGLIN

SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY

Conservatee

SHARON ADELE JEGLIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Conservatee Attorney

HORSPOOL, KARIN E

300 E State Street Ste 200

Redlands, CA 92373

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/02/2019
  • ACCOUNTING REVIEW BY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • CONSERVATORSHIP INVESTIGATOR REVIEW RE: CI ANNUAL REVIEW DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • CLAIM IN THE AMOUNT OF $1765.00 FORWARDED TO FINANCE & ADMINISTRATION OFFICE/INDIGENT DEFENSE FOR PAYMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • CLAIM RECEIVED VERIFIED AND FORWARDED TO DEPARTMENT S35 FOR SIGNATURE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • CLAIM IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,365.00 RECEIVED FROM KARIN E HORSPOOL FOR 09/20/17 TO 07/20/18.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • CONSERVATORSHIP COMPLIANCE REVIEW HEARING ON PETITION FOR CONSERVATORSHIP FILED 09/14/2017 OF MARVIN JEGLIN; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; STANFORD E. REICHERT, JUDGE; CLERK: SHANNON PRATT; COURT REPORTER CHERYL ORTEGA 13709; COURT ATTENDANT D MORENO; APPEARANCES:; MARVIN JEGLIN APPEARS BY COURT CALL.; PROCEEDINGS:; REVIEW HEARING HELD; THE COURT CLEARS ALL NOTES. THE ESTATE ISSUES ARE APPLICABLE TO THE ACCOUNTING REVIEW, SET FOR; 01/02/19. ALL COMPLIANCE DOCUMENTS HAVE BEEN FILED.; HEARINGS:; HEARING DATE OF 01/02/19 CONFIRMED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY MARVIN H JEGLIN FOR FAX; Minutes; Receipt: 180530-0497 $4.00; 180530-0497-MC Reference Number 031-0117282624

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • DECLARATION OF ATTORNEY MARVIN H JEGLIN FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • HRG OF 05/30/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • DETERMINATION OF CONSERVATEE'S APPROPRIATE LEVEL OF CARE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
48 More Docket Entries
  • 09/14/2017
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON APPT COUNSEL FOR CONSERVATEE RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • LIST OF REQUIRED CONTACT INFORMATION FOR CONSERVATORSHIPS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON APPT COURT INVESTIGATOR RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • DUTIES OF CONSERVATOR AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT OF HANDBOOK FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • COURT INVESTIGATOR'S REFERRAL REPORT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • CONFIDENTIAL SUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • CAPACITY DECLARATION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S35P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF CONSERVATOR OF THE PERSON & ESTATE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (CONSERVATORSHIP); Minutes; Receipt: 170915-0830 $513.00; 170915-0830-VS Reference Number 031-0043641233

    Read MoreRead Less