This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/11/2018 at 21:28:06 (UTC).

MTR OF RONALD J ZWOLINSKI

Case Summary

On 09/20/2017 MTR OF RONALD J ZWOLINSKI was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0949

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GINA ZWOLINSKI

Decedent

RONALD ZWOLINSKI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

DENNIS M SANDOVAL

3233 Arlington Ave Ste 105

Riverside, CA 92506

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 03/26/18 FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 03/26/18 FILED.

HRG OF 01/22/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 01/22/18 - PROBATE NOTES

WAIVER OF NOTICE OF SPOUSAL PROPERTY PET/MATTHEW ZWOLINSK FILED.

WAIVER OF NOTICE OF SPOUSAL PROPERTY PET/MATTHEW ZWOLINSK FILED.

WAIVER OF NOTICE OF SPOUSAL PROPERTY PET/KARA ZWOLINSKI FILED.

WAIVER OF NOTICE OF SPOUSAL PROPERTY PET/KARA ZWOLINSKI FILED.

WAIVER OF NOTICE OF SPOUSAL PROPERTY PET/ERIC HANS FILED.

WAIVER OF NOTICE OF SPOUSAL PROPERTY PET/ERIC HANS FILED.

WAIVER OF NOTICE OF SPOUSAL PROPERTY PET/KRISTI BUDD FILED.

WAIVER OF NOTICE OF SPOUSAL PROPERTY PET/KRISTI BUDD FILED.

WAIVER OF NOTICE OF SPOUSAL PROPERTY PET/GINA ZWOLINSKI FILED.

WAIVER OF NOTICE OF SPOUSAL PROPERTY PET/GINA ZWOLINSKI FILED.

WAIVER OF NOTICE OF SPOUSAL PROPERTY PET/PAUL F MEZGER FILED.

WAIVER OF NOTICE OF SPOUSAL PROPERTY PET/PAUL F MEZGER FILED.

SUPPLEMENTAL TO SPOUSAL PROPERTY PETITION FILED. (IMAGED)

SUPPLEMENTAL TO SPOUSAL PROPERTY PETITION FILED. (IMAGED)

HRG OF 01/22/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 01/22/18 - PROBATE NOTES

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 01/22/18 FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 01/22/18 FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

SPOUSAL/DOMESTIC PARTNER PROPERTY PETITION FILED.

SPOUSAL/DOMESTIC PARTNER PROPERTY PETITION FILED.

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2018
  • SPOUSAL OR DOMESTIC PARTNER PROPERTY ORDER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY GINA ZWOLINSKI FOR 1 CC ORDER ON SPOUSAL PROPERTY PETITION; Minutes; Receipt: 180618-0317 $26.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • SPOUSAL PROPERTY PETITION HEARING.; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; TARA REILLY, JUDGE; CLERK: ELIZABETH DEATHERAGE; COURT REPORTER KIM HORSTMEYER 11522; COURT ATTENDANT R KRETZMEIER; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY DAVID HAMILTON PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); SPOUSAL PROPERTY PETITION FILED 09/20/2017 OF GINA ZWOLINSKI IS GRANTED; ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE.; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION - SPOUSAL PROPERTY PETITION FILED 09/20/2017 OF GINA ZWOLINSKI ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); DISPOSITION ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • HRG OF 06/18/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • HRG OF 06/18/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • HRG OF 06/18/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • SPOUSAL PROPERTY PETITION HEARING.; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; TARA REILLY, JUDGE; CLERK: SHANNON PRATT; COURT REPORTER KIM HORSTMEYER 11522; COURT ATTENDANT R KRETZMEIER; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY PAMELA VALENCIA PRESENT FOR GINA ZWOLINSKI.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF COURT.; REASON: TO REFER MATTER TO LEGAL RESEARCH.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 06/18/18 AT 08:35 IN DEPARTMENT S37P.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • HRG OF 03/26/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • DECLARATION OF GINA ZWOLINSKI AND SUPPLEMENT TO SPOUSAL PRTY PTN FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • HRG OF 03/26/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 01/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUPPLEMENTAL TO SPOUSAL PROPERTY PETITION FILED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY GINA ZWOLINSKI FOR FAX; Minutes; Receipt: 180117-0059 $9.00; 180117-0059-MC Reference Number 031-0077661342

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 01/22/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY GINA ZWOLINSKI FOR FAX; Minutes; Receipt: 171002-0798 $6.00; 171002-0798-MC Reference Number 031-0047933889

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON SPOUSAL PROPERTY RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON 01/22/18 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S37P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SPOUSAL/DOMESTIC PARTNER PROPERTY PETITION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE); Minutes; Receipt: 170926-0711 $541.00; 170926-0711-MC Reference Number 031-0046238243

    Read MoreRead Less