This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/13/2018 at 02:03:05 (UTC).

MTR OF ROBERT C HUNTLEY

Case Summary

On 11/04/2016 MTR OF ROBERT C HUNTLEY was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1104

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JARED HUNTLEY

Decedent

ROBERT C HUNTLEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF RICHARD SAMUEL PRICE

300 E State Suite 600

Redlands, CA 92373

 

Court Documents

ORDER SETTLING FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNTING AND REPORT OF ADMINSITRATION FILED.

ORDER SETTLING FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNTING AND REPORT OF ADMINSITRATION FILED.

HRG OF 12/05/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 12/05/17 - PROBATE NOTES

SUPPLEMENTAL VERIFIED BY PETITIONER JARED R. HUNTLEY FOR FIRST AND FINAL REPORT ETC FILED. (IMAGED)

SUPPLEMENTAL VERIFIED BY PETITIONER JARED R. HUNTLEY FOR FIRST AND FINAL REPORT ETC FILED. (IMAGED)

WAIVER OF ACC BY DISTRIBUTEE FILED.

WAIVER OF ACC BY DISTRIBUTEE FILED.

FIRST & FINAL ACCOUNTING REPORT FILED BY JARED HUNTLEY

FIRST & FINAL ACCOUNTING REPORT FILED BY JARED HUNTLEY

INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL: REAPPRAISAL FOR SALE ILED.

INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL: REAPPRAISAL FOR SALE ILED.

INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL: PROPERTY TAX CERTIFICATE ILED.

INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL: PROPERTY TAX CERTIFICATE ILED.

CREDITORS CLAIM FILED BY ASCENSIONPOINT RECOVERY SERVICES FOR CITIBANK. TOTAL AMOUNT OF CLAIM IS $4,368.47.

CREDITORS CLAIM FILED BY ASCENSIONPOINT RECOVERY SERVICES FOR CITIBANK. TOTAL AMOUNT OF CLAIM IS $4,368.47.

CREDITORS CLAIM FILED BY ASCENSION POINT RECOVERY SERVICES, LLC. TOTAL AMOUNT OF CLAIM IS $1,317.20.

CREDITORS CLAIM FILED BY ASCENSION POINT RECOVERY SERVICES, LLC. TOTAL AMOUNT OF CLAIM IS $1,317.20.

CREDITORS CLAIM FILED BY CAPITAL ONE. TOTAL AMOUNT OF CLAIM IS $5,126.05.

CREDITORS CLAIM FILED BY CAPITAL ONE. TOTAL AMOUNT OF CLAIM IS $5,126.05.

PROOF OF HOLOGRAPHIC WILL FILED.

PROOF OF HOLOGRAPHIC WILL FILED.

HRG OF 01/10/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 01/10/17 - PROBATE NOTES

CREDITORS CLAIM FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB. TOTAL AMOUNT OF CLAIM IS $1,349.32.

CREDITORS CLAIM FILED BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB. TOTAL AMOUNT OF CLAIM IS $1,349.32.

PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED.

PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED.

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY JARED HUNTLEY

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY JARED HUNTLEY

RCPT FOR WILL LODGED WITH COURT PLACED IN FILE

RCPT FOR WILL LODGED WITH COURT PLACED IN FILE

DEATH CERTIFICATE IN SUPPORT OF PET FOR PROBATE FILED.

DEATH CERTIFICATE IN SUPPORT OF PET FOR PROBATE FILED.

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY JARED HUNTLEY

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY JARED HUNTLEY

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2018
  • HEARING RE FINAL DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • ACCOUNTING REVIEW BY; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY JARED HUNTLEY FOR FAX FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 171219-0795 $2.00; 171219-0795-VS Reference Number 031-0069995119

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT RE: ATTORNEY FOR THE PERSONAL REP. - R. SAM PRICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER SETTLING FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNTING AND REPORT OF ADMINSITRATION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY JARED HUNTLEY FOR CERTIFIED COPY; Minutes; Receipt: 171205-0088 $26.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • FIRST & FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF JARED HUNTLEY AND PETITION FOR ALLOWANCE OF FEES FILED.; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; JAMES MICHAEL WELCH, JUDGE; CLERK: RACHELE ANDREWS; COURT REPORTER CATHY ALBRITTON 7137; COURT ATTENDANT D MADISON; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY RYAN FENDER PRESENT FOR JARED HUNTLEY.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNTING APPROVED/GRANTED.; ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE.; HEARINGS:; HEARING RE FINAL DISCHARGE SET FOR 12/11/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S36P.; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION: SUBSEQUENT PETITION BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); DISPOSITION SUBSEQUENT PETITION BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 12/05/17 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUPPLEMENTAL VERIFIED BY PETITIONER JARED R. HUNTLEY FOR FIRST AND FINAL REPORT ETC FILED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 12/05/17 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 11/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • RCPT FOR WILL LODGED WITH COURT PLACED IN FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2016
  • PROPOSED LETTERS RECEIVED (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DEATH CERTIFICATE IN SUPPORT OF PET FOR PROBATE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY JARED HUNTLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2016
  • CONFIDENTIAL STATEMENT OF BIRTH DATE AND DRIVER'S LICENSE NUMBER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S36P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2016
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON APPOINTING ADMINISTRATOR W/WILL ANNEXED RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION RE: PROBATE OF WILL & FOR LTRS OF ADMINISTRATION W/ WILL ANNEXED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2016
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE); Minutes; Receipt: 161104-0139 $465.00; 161104-0139-CK Reference Number 1435

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.