This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/11/2018 at 12:08:44 (UTC).

MTR OF RICHARD S WALLER

Case Summary

On 01/20/2017 MTR OF RICHARD S WALLER was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0049

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JOANNE KNATCHER

Decedent

RICHARD S WALLER

Other

LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

GLADSON, LINDA J

3237 E, Guasti Road Suite 220

Ontario, CA 91761-1243

VARNER & BRANDT

3237 E Guasti Road Ste. 220

Ontario, CA 91761

 

Court Documents

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY JOANNE KNATCHER

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY JOANNE KNATCHER

PETITION RE: PROBATE OF WILL & FOR LTRS TESTAMENTARY W/FULL IAEA FILED.

PETITION RE: PROBATE OF WILL & FOR LTRS TESTAMENTARY W/FULL IAEA FILED.

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY JOANNE KNATCHER

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY JOANNE KNATCHER

RCPT FOR WILL LODGED WITH COURT PLACED IN FILE

RCPT FOR WILL LODGED WITH COURT PLACED IN FILE

PETITION RE: PROBATE OF WILL & FOR LTRS TESTAMENTARY W/FULL IAEA FILED.

PETITION RE: PROBATE OF WILL & FOR LTRS TESTAMENTARY W/FULL IAEA FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

RCPT FOR WILL LODGED WITH COURT PLACED IN FILE

RCPT FOR WILL LODGED WITH COURT PLACED IN FILE

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2019
  • HEARING RE FINAL DISCHARGE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • ACCOUNTING REVIEW BY; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • DECLARATION AND ORDER FOR FINAL DISCHARGE FILED.; Minutes; ACTION - COMPLETE; CASE CLOSED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON EXPARTE PTN FOR FINAL DISCHARGE RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • RECEIPT RE: OF DISTRIBUTION JOANNE KNATCHER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • ORDER APPROVING WVR OF ACCOUNT & REPORT OF EXECUTOR FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • WAIVER OF ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF JOANNE KNATCHER AND PETITION FOR ALLOWANCE OF FEES FILED.; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; TARA REILLY, JUDGE; CLERK: ELIZABETH DEATHERAGE; COURT REPORTER KIM HORSTMEYER 11522; COURT ATTENDANT R KRETZMEIER; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY LINDA GLADSON PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING APPROVED/GRANTED.; ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE.; HEARINGS:; HEARING RE FINAL DISCHARGE SET FOR 03/20/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S37P.; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION: SUBSEQUENT PETITION BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); DISPOSITION SUBSEQUENT PETITION BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • HRG OF 03/14/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • HRG OF 03/14/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON 031418 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 01/20/2017
  • ORIGINAL WILL LODGED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • RCPT FOR WILL LODGED WITH COURT PLACED IN FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S37P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY JOANNE KNATCHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • CONFIDENTIAL STATEMENT OF BIRTH DATE AND DRIVER'S LICENSE NUMBER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • PROPOSED LETTERS RECEIVED (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON APPOINTING EXECUTOR RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION RE: PROBATE OF WILL & FOR LTRS TESTAMENTARY W/FULL IAEA FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE); Minutes; Receipt: 170120-0881 $465.00; 170120-0881-CK Reference Number 9526

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.