This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/12/2018 at 18:35:53 (UTC).

MTR OF RICHARD MCNUTT

Case Summary

On 11/08/2016 MTR OF RICHARD MCNUTT was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0333

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MARK J ANDREW FLORY

Trustee and Conservator

INLAND COUNTIES REGIONAL CENTER, INC.,

Others and Conservatees

RICHARD MCNUTT

DEPT OF HEALTH CARE SERVICES

Not Classified By Court

SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Trustee and Conservator Attorney

LAYNE A BARTHOLOMEW

222 N Mountain Ave Ste 100

Upland, CA 91786

 

Court Documents

HRG OF 04/25/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 04/25/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 04/25/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 04/25/18 - PROBATE NOTES

FIRST ACCOUNT MASTER TRUST VERIFICATION OF ACCOUNT FUNDS FILED.

FIRST ACCOUNT MASTER TRUST VERIFICATION OF ACCOUNT FUNDS FILED.

HRG OF 07/30/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 07/30/18 - PROBATE NOTES

CREDITORS CLAIM FILED BY DEPT OF HEALTH CARE SERVICES, SPECIAL NEEDS TRUST. TOTAL AMOUNT OF CLAIM IS $674,377.84.

CREDITORS CLAIM FILED BY DEPT OF HEALTH CARE SERVICES, SPECIAL NEEDS TRUST. TOTAL AMOUNT OF CLAIM IS $674,377.84.

REQUEST FOR SPECIAL NOTICE BY DEPT OF HEALTH CARE SERVICES FILED.

REQUEST FOR SPECIAL NOTICE BY DEPT OF HEALTH CARE SERVICES FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 042518 FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 042518 FILED.

PETITION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES FILED BY MARK J ANDREW FLORY(PROBATE).

PETITION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES FILED BY MARK J ANDREW FLORY(PROBATE).

DECLARATION OF CONSERVATOR RE: FUNDS TRANSFERRED TO MASTER TRUST FILED

DECLARATION OF CONSERVATOR RE: FUNDS TRANSFERRED TO MASTER TRUST FILED

SURETY BOND ISSUED INLAND COUNTIES REGIONAL CENTER, INC IN THE AMT OF 71,000.00 BY SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY FILED.

SURETY BOND ISSUED INLAND COUNTIES REGIONAL CENTER, INC IN THE AMT OF 71,000.00 BY SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY FILED.

LETTERS ISSUED ( INLAND COUNTIES REGIONAL CENTER, ESTATE ONLY)

LETTERS ISSUED ( INLAND COUNTIES REGIONAL CENTER, ESTATE ONLY)

HRG OF 04/10/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 04/10/17 - PROBATE NOTES

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FOR RICHARDMCNUTT FILED.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FOR RICHARDMCNUTT FILED.; Minutes; POST-MOVE

CITATION FOR CONSERVATORSHIP AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

CITATION FOR CONSERVATORSHIP AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 01/09/17 W/POS FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 01/09/17 W/POS FILED.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

DUTIES OF CONSERVATOR AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT OF HANDBOOK FILED.

DUTIES OF CONSERVATOR AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT OF HANDBOOK FILED.

PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF CONSERVATOR OF THE ESTATE FILED.

PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF CONSERVATOR OF THE ESTATE FILED.

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2018
  • FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF INLAND COUNTIES REGIONAL CENTER, INC., AND PETITION FOR ALLOWANCE OF FEES FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 09/18/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON 09/18/18 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • ACCOUNTING REVIEW BY; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • FIRST ACCOUNT MASTER TRUST VERIFICATION OF ACCOUNT FUNDS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE SECTION 6103.5 FEES FOR INLAND COUNTIES REGIONAL CENTER, INC., ARE WAIVED FOR FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNTING IN THE AMOUNT OF $230.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNTING RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNTING REPORT FILED BY INLAND COUNTIES REGIONAL CENTER, INC.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • VACATE PRARV HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 07/30/18 AT 09:30 IN DEPARTMENT S35.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 07/30/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
50 More Docket Entries
  • 11/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE MIRIANNE KIRK FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • CONFIDENTIAL SUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DUTIES OF CONSERVATOR AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT OF HANDBOOK FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTIFICATION TO COURT OF ADDRESS OF CONSERVATORSHIP FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • PROBATE INVESTIGATORS' REFERRAL REPORT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • LIST OF REQUIRED CONTACT INFORMATION FOR CONSERVATORSHIPS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF CONSERVATOR OF THE ESTATE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (CONSERVATORSHIP)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE SECTION 6103.5 FEES FOR INLAND COUNTIES REGIONAL CENTER, INC., ARE WAIVED FOR PETITION FOR CONSERVATOR OF THE ESTATE IN THE AMOUNT OF $465.00.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.