This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/11/2018 at 14:48:33 (UTC).

MTR OF RICHARD MARTINEZ

Case Summary

On 03/15/2017 MTR OF RICHARD MARTINEZ was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0241

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PHYLLIS MARTINEZ

Decedent

RICHARD MARTINEZ

Other

THOMAS W DOMINICK

San Bernardino, CA 92401

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ROSADO, ROSE C

14335 Park Avenue

Victorville, CA 92392

Other Attorney

DOMINICK, THOMAS W

215 N 'D' St First Floor

San Bernardino, CA 92401

 

Court Documents

LETTERS ISSUED ( SPECIAL ADMINISTRATION)

LETTERS ISSUED ( SPECIAL ADMINISTRATION)

ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR, PHYLLIS MARTINEZ APPOINTED WITH LIMITED IAEA. BOND NOT REQ, PATRICK WRIGHT APPOINTED PROBATE REFEREE, FILED.

ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR, PHYLLIS MARTINEZ APPOINTED WITH LIMITED IAEA. BOND NOT REQ, PATRICK WRIGHT APPOINTED PROBATE REFEREE, FILED.

PETITION FOR LETTERS OF SPECIAL ADMINISTRATION FILED BY W/LIMITED IAEA(PROBATE).

PETITION FOR LETTERS OF SPECIAL ADMINISTRATION FILED BY W/LIMITED IAEA(PROBATE).

PETITION RE: FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION W/FULL IAEA FILED.

PETITION RE: FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION W/FULL IAEA FILED.

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY PHYLLIS MARTINEZ

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY PHYLLIS MARTINEZ

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2018
  • ACCOUNTING REVIEW BY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • REQUEST FOR SPECIAL NOTICE BY JEANNE E KENNEDY FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 180829-0435 $40.00; 180829-0435-CK Reference Number 65855

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING ROSE C ROSADO WITH ROSE C ROSADO AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR PHYLLIS MARTINEZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • ACCOUNTING REVIEW BY; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; STANFORD E. REICHERT, JUDGE; CLERK: TIFFANY KRETZMEIER; COURT REPORTER DIANE HICKMAN 13147; COURT ATTENDANT D MORENO; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY ROSE ROSADO PRESENT FOR PHYLLIS MARTINEZ.; SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY ROSE ROSADO FOR THOMAS DOMINICK FOR THOMAS DOMINICK.; PROCEEDINGS:; REVIEW HEARING HELD; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF COUNSEL.; REASON: TO FILE ACCOUNTING; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 09/26/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S35P.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • HRG OF 08/01/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • HRG OF 08/01/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • NOTICE OF PROPOSED ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • ALLOWANCE & REJECTION OF CREDITORS CLAIM FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL: FINAL ILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • RESPONSE FROM DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH SERVICES FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 03/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION RE: FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION W/FULL IAEA FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY PHYLLIS MARTINEZ FOR PETITION AND SPECIAL PETITION; Minutes; Receipt: 170315-0969 $695.00; 170315-0969-VS Reference Number 031-0009481188

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • PROPOSED LETTERS RECEIVED (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY PHYLLIS MARTINEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON APPTING ADMINISTRATOR W/FULL IAEA RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • CONFIDENTIAL STATEMENT OF BIRTH DATE AND DRIVER'S LICENSE NUMBER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • PROPOSED LETTERS RECEIVED (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON APPTING SPECIAL ADMIN RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less