This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/11/2018 at 20:18:06 (UTC).

MTR OF RICHARD HERNANDEZ

Case Summary

On 07/17/2017 MTR OF RICHARD HERNANDEZ was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0707

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

HARWOOD GARLAND

LORENA JANETTE HERNANDEZ

Decedent

RICHARD HERNANDEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

OPERINI, EDWARD G

16820 Ivy Avenue

Fontana, CA 92335

MADDUX, MICHAEL C

1894 Commercenter Drive West Ste 108

San Bernardino, CA 92408

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY HARWOOD GARLAND

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY HARWOOD GARLAND

RECEIPT FOR WILL LODGED WITH THE COURT PLACED IN FILE

RECEIPT FOR WILL LODGED WITH THE COURT PLACED IN FILE

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY HARWOOD GARLAND

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY HARWOOD GARLAND

PROOF OF HOLOGRAPHIC WILL FILED.

PROOF OF HOLOGRAPHIC WILL FILED.

PROOF OF SUBSCRIBING WITNESS FILED BY HARWOOD GARLAND

PROOF OF SUBSCRIBING WITNESS FILED BY HARWOOD GARLAND

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

PETITION RE: PROBATE OF WILL/LETTERS TESTAMENTARY W/FULL IAEA FILED.

PETITION RE: PROBATE OF WILL/LETTERS TESTAMENTARY W/FULL IAEA FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2019
  • ACCOUNTING REVIEW BY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • SATISFACTION AND RELEASE OF CREDITORS CLAIM FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • HEARING RE: RECEIPT OF BOND; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY HARWOOD GARLAND FOR CERTIFIED COPIES; Minutes; Receipt: 180530-0084 $25.50; 180530-0084-CK Reference Number 5270

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • VACATE HRG HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 06/11/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S37P.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY HARWOOD GARLAND FOR CERTIFIED COPIES OF LETTERS-2; Minutes; Receipt: 180402-0118 $51.00; 180402-0118-CK Reference Number 5218

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • LETTERS ISSUED ( TESTAMENTARY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • CASE ADDED TO COURT SUPERVISION (PROBATE).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • SURETY BOND ISSUED SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY IN THE AMT OF 300,000.00 BY HARWOOD GARLAND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • ORDER APPOINTING EXECUTOR, RICHARD HERNANDEZ APPOINTED WITH FULL IAEA. BOND IS FIXED AT $300,000.00, B.M.GARVIN APPOINTED PROBATE REFEREE, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
54 More Docket Entries
  • 07/17/2017
  • ORIGINAL WILL LODGED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY HARWOOD GARLAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • CONFIDENTIAL STATEMENT OF BIRTH DATE AND DRIVER'S LICENSE NUMBER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON APPOINTING EXECUTOR W/FULL IAEA RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF HOLOGRAPHIC WILL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUBSCRIBING WITNESS FILED BY HARWOOD GARLAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION RE: PROBATE OF WILL/LETTERS TESTAMENTARY W/FULL IAEA FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S37P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE); Minutes; Receipt: 170717-0987 $465.00; 170717-0987-CK Reference Number 4960

    Read MoreRead Less