This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/13/2018 at 00:25:57 (UTC).

MTR OF RICHARD ALVIN STOCK

Case Summary

On 09/15/2016 MTR OF RICHARD ALVIN STOCK was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0934

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DAVID L STOCK

Decedent

RICHARD ALVIN STOCK

Not Classified By Court

SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY

Other

THEODORE A STOCK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BETHEL, DALE K

43471 Ridge Park Drive Ste E

Temecula, CA 92590

Other Attorney

HARTNELL, BRYAN C

25757 Redlands Blvd

Redlands, CA 92373

 

Court Documents

SUPPLEMENTAL TO FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF ADMINISTRATOR, ETC FILED. (IMAGED)

SUPPLEMENTAL TO FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF ADMINISTRATOR, ETC FILED. (IMAGED)

HRG OF 07/24/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 07/24/18 - PROBATE NOTES

SUPPLEMENTAL TO FRIST AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF ADMINISTRATOR ETC FILED. (IMAGED)

SUPPLEMENTAL TO FRIST AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF ADMINISTRATOR ETC FILED. (IMAGED)

WAIVER OF ACCOUNT AND ASSIGNMENT OF INTEREST FILED.

WAIVER OF ACCOUNT AND ASSIGNMENT OF INTEREST FILED.

FIRST & FINAL ACCOUNTING REPORT FILED BY DAVID L STOCK

FIRST & FINAL ACCOUNTING REPORT FILED BY DAVID L STOCK

HRG OF 05/07/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 05/07/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 05/07/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 05/07/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 02/26/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 02/26/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 02/26/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 02/26/18 - PROBATE NOTES

CITATION SENT TO AMERICAN EAGLE ATTORNEY SERVICES, INC. FOR SERVICE OF CITATION ON DALE K BETHEL.

CITATION SENT TO AMERICAN EAGLE ATTORNEY SERVICES, INC. FOR SERVICE OF CITATION ON DALE K BETHEL.

CITATION ISSUED. (IMAGED)

CITATION ISSUED. (IMAGED)

CITATION SENT TO SBSO-HIGH DESERT FOR SERVICE OF CITATION ON DAVID L STOCK.

CITATION SENT TO SBSO-HIGH DESERT FOR SERVICE OF CITATION ON DAVID L STOCK.

INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL: FINAL ILED.

INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL: FINAL ILED.

HRG OF 12/15/16 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 12/15/16 - PROBATE NOTES

NOTICE OF 12/6/16 MINUTE ORDER (IMAGED)

NOTICE OF 12/6/16 MINUTE ORDER (IMAGED)

HRG OF 12/01/16 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 12/01/16 - PROBATE NOTES

ORDER APPOINTING ADMINISTRATOR, DAVID L STOCK APPOINTED WITH FULL IAEA. BOND IS FIXED AT $84,000.00, B.M. GARVIN APPOINTED PROBATE REFEREE, FILED.

ORDER APPOINTING ADMINISTRATOR, DAVID L STOCK APPOINTED WITH FULL IAEA. BOND IS FIXED AT $84,000.00, B.M. GARVIN APPOINTED PROBATE REFEREE, FILED.

PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED.

PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED.

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2019
  • HEARING RE FINAL DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 180724-0055 $26.50; 180724-0055-VS Reference Number 031-0130864100

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER SETTLING FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNTING AND REPORT OF ADMINISTRATOR FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • FIRST & FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF DAVID L STOCK AND PETITION FOR ALLOWANCE OF FEES FILED.; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; JAMES MICHAEL WELCH, JUDGE; CLERK: RACHELE ANDREWS; COURT REPORTER CATHY ALBRITTON 7137; COURT ATTENDANT D NEWCOMB; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY DALE BETHEL PRESENT FOR DAVID STOCK.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); SUPPLEMENT CLEARING PROBATE NOTES.; FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNTING APPROVED/GRANTED.; ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE.; HEARINGS:; HEARING RE FINAL DISCHARGE SET FOR 08/06/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S36P.; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION: SUBSEQUENT PETITION BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); DISPOSITION SUBSEQUENT PETITION BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON SETTLING FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUPPLEMENTAL TO FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF ADMINISTRATOR, ETC FILED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY DAVID L STOCK FOR FAX; Minutes; Receipt: 180725-1049 $6.00; 180725-1049-MC Reference Number 031-0131416050

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 07/24/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • ACCOUNTING REVIEW BY; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUPPLEMENTAL TO FRIST AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF ADMINISTRATOR ETC FILED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 10/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY DAVID L STOCK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY DAVID L STOCK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • PROPOSED LETTERS RECEIVED (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S36P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • CONFIDENTIAL STATEMENT OF BIRTH DATE AND DRIVER'S LICENSE NUMBER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION RE: LETTERS OF ADMIN W/ FULL AUTH TO ADMIN UNDER IAEA FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE); Minutes; Receipt: 160919-0895 $465.00; 160919-0895-CK Reference Number 3934

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.