This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/11/2018 at 13:00:59 (UTC).

MTR OF RANDY JOSEPH BAUER

Case Summary

On 01/31/2017 MTR OF RANDY JOSEPH BAUER was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0101

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LAWRENCE A HEMPEN

Decedent

RANDY JOSEPH BAUER

Other

CALIFORNIA VICTIM COMPENSATIONBOARD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF AMYGOSTANIAN, PC

1201 Dove Street Ste 475

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2019
  • HEARING RE FINAL DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • ACCOUNTING REVIEW BY; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • RECEIPT RE: OF DISTRIBUTION BY CODI JOHANNA BAUER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • RECEIPT RE: OF DISTRIBUTION BY DARIN VERNON BAUER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • RECEIPT RE: OF DISTRIBUTION BY LAUREN CAMILLE KRAMER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • RECEIPT RE: OF DISTRIBUTION BY RANDY JOSEPH BAUER-GARIBALDI FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • RECEIPT RE: OF DISTRIBUTION BY DANIELLE HAZEL MESA FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • RECEIPT RE: OF ADMINISTRATOR RESTATUTORY BY LAWRENCE A HEMPEN FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • RECEIPT RE: OF DISTRIBUTION BY RIDGE MANUEL BAUER-GARIBALDI FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • RECEIPT RE: OF ATTORNEY RESTATUTORY BY AMY L. GOSTANIAN FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
55 More Docket Entries
  • 02/16/2017
  • NOMINATION OF ADMINISTRATOR BY CODI JOHANNA BAUER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • WAIVER OF BOND BY HEIR OR BENEFICIARY, DARIN BAUER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • WAIVER OF BOND BY HEIR OR BENEFICIARY, DANIELLE MESA FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • WAIVER OF BOND BY HEIR OR BENEFICIARY, LAUREN KRAMER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY LAWRENCE A HEMPEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • CONFIDENTIAL STATEMENT OF BIRTH DATE AND DRIVER'S LICENSE NUMBER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S35P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON APPOINTING ADMINISTRATOR RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • PETITION RE: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION WITH FULL AUTHORIZATION TO ADMINISTER UNDER IAEA FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE); Minutes; Receipt: 170203-0528 $494.38; 170203-0528-VS Reference Number 031-0006169591

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.