This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/11/2018 at 20:13:07 (UTC).

MTR OF NATALIA GUERRA

Case Summary

On 07/12/2017 MTR OF NATALIA GUERRA was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0686

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ANGELICA GUERRA

Decedent

NATALIA GUERRA

Other

JUAN D GUERRA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

E. MARIE HENNING

1254 South Waterman Avenue Suite 07

San Bernardino, CA 92408

Other Attorney

DEAN, JOHN THEODORE

2678 Raven Circle

Corona, CA 91720

 

Court Documents

SUPPLEMENTAL TO PROBATE: ESTATE OF NATALIA GUERRA INFORMATION TO CLEAR PROBATE NOTES FILED. (IMAGED)

SUPPLEMENTAL TO PROBATE: ESTATE OF NATALIA GUERRA INFORMATION TO CLEAR PROBATE NOTES FILED. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED.

PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED.

REQUEST FOR SPECIAL NOTICE BY JOHN THEODORE DEAN ESQ FILED.

REQUEST FOR SPECIAL NOTICE BY JOHN THEODORE DEAN ESQ FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170817-0150 $40.00

SUPPLEMENTAL TO PROBATE:ESTATE OF NATALIA GUERRA CORRECTIONS TO PETITION PAGE 4, SECTION 8 FILED. (IMAGED)

SUPPLEMENTAL TO PROBATE:ESTATE OF NATALIA GUERRA CORRECTIONS TO PETITION PAGE 4, SECTION 8 FILED. (IMAGED)

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY ANGELICA GUERRA

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY ANGELICA GUERRA

HRG OF 08/28/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 08/28/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 08/28/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 08/28/17 - PROBATE NOTES

WAIVER OF EXECUTRIX FILED.

WAIVER OF EXECUTRIX FILED.

NOMINATION OF ADMINISTRATOR FILED.

NOMINATION OF ADMINISTRATOR FILED.

WAIVER OF EXECUTOR FILED.

WAIVER OF EXECUTOR FILED.

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY ANGELICA GUERRA

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY ANGELICA GUERRA

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

PETITION RE: PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION WITH WILL ANNEXED FILED.

PETITION RE: PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION WITH WILL ANNEXED FILED.

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2019
  • HEARING RE FINAL DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • ACCOUNTING REVIEW BY; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 180612-0090 $26.00; 180612-0090-DB Reference Number 031-0121184743

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • ORDER FPR PETITION FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION ON WAIVER OF A CCOUNTING FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • PETITION FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION ON WAIVER OF ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF ANGELICA GUERRA AND PETITION FOR ALLOWANCE OF FEES FILED.; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; JAMES MICHAEL WELCH, JUDGE; CLERK: RACHELE ANDREWS; COURT REPORTER CATHY ALBRITTON 7137; COURT ATTENDANT D NEWCOMB; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY E MARIE HENNING PRESENT FOR ANGELICA GUERRA.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); FINAL DISTRIBUTION AND WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING APPROVED/GRANTED.; ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE.; HEARINGS:; HEARING RE FINAL DISCHARGE SET FOR 06/18/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S36P.; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION: SUBSEQUENT PETITION BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); DISPOSITION SUBSEQUENT PETITION BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • HEARING RE FINAL DISCHARGE; Disposition: Off Calendar; Minutes; JAMES MICHAEL WELCH, JUDGE; CLERK: RACHELE ANDREWS; COURT REPORTER CATHY ALBRITTON 7137; COURT ATTENDANT D NEWCOMB; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY E MARIE HENNING PRESENT FOR ANGELICA GUERRA.; PROCEEDINGS:; REVIEW HEARING HELD; OFF-CALENDAR. REASON: THIS WAS SET IN ERROR/ HEARING IS PREMATURE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • HRG OF 06/12/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON FOR PTN FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION ON WAIVER RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • SUPPLEMENT TO CLEAR PROBATE NOTES FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • HEARING RE FINAL DISCHARGE; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; JAMES MICHAEL WELCH, JUDGE; CLERK: RACHELE ANDREWS; COURT REPORTER CATHY ALBRITTON 7137; COURT ATTENDANT GARY TREADWAY; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; REVIEW HEARING HELD; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF COURT.; REASON: TO BE HEARD WITH OTHER PENDING PETITION.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 06/12/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S36P.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
51 More Docket Entries
  • 07/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WAIVER OF EXECUTRIX FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOMINATION OF ADMINISTRATOR FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • CONFIDENTIAL STATEMENT OF BIRTH DATE AND DRIVER'S LICENSE NUMBER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON APPOINTING ADMINISTRATOR W WILL ANNEXED RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WAIVER OF EXECUTOR FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • PROPOSED LETTERS RECEIVED (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY ANGELICA GUERRA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S36P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION RE: PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION WITH WILL ANNEXED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less