This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/11/2018 at 13:05:59 (UTC).

MTR OF MARY RUTH VERDUZCO

Case Summary

On 02/06/2017 MTR OF MARY RUTH VERDUZCO was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0109

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LYNN M JIMENEZ

Decedent

MARY RUTH VERDUZCO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2018
  • ACCOUNTING REVIEW BY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • HRG OF 09/20/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON LYNN M JIMENEZ FOR CERTIFIED COPY OF LETTER IN THE AMOUNT OF $25.50.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • LETTERS ISSUED ( EXECUTOR)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • CASE ADDED TO COURT SUPERVISION (PROBATE).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • ORDER APPOINTING EXECUTOR, LYNN M JIMEENEZ APPOINTED WITH FULL IAEA. BOND NOT REQUIRED, PATRICK B WRIGHT APPOINTED PROBATE REFEREE, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY WITH FULL AUTHORIZATION TO ADMINISTER UNDER IAEA; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; TARA REILLY, JUDGE; CLERK: TRACY MORRIS; COURT REPORTER KIM HORSTMEYER 11522; COURT ATTENDANT R KRETZMEIER; APPEARANCES:; LYNN M. JIMENEZ PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); WILL ADMITTED.; PETITION FOR WILL AND LETTERS TESTAMENTARY FILED 02/06/2017 OF LYNN JIMENEZ IS GRANTED; LYNN M JIMENEZ IS/ARE APPOINTED PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE: EXECUTOR; IS AUTHORIZED TO ADMINISTER ESTATE UNDER IAEA WITH FULL POWERS.; NO BOND IS REQUIRED.; ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE.; HEARINGS:; ACCOUNTING REVIEW SET FOR 09/20/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S37P.; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION - PETITION FOR WILL AND LETTERS TESTAMENTARY FILED 02/06/2017 OF LYNN JIMENEZ ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); DISPOSITION ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • HRG OF 07/13/17 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • HRG OF 07/13/17 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NTC OF PTN TO ADMIN ESTATE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 02/06/2017
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON EXECUTOR RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • CONFIDENTIAL STATEMENT OF BIRTH DATE AND DRIVER'S LICENSE NUMBER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY LYNN M JIMENEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY LYNN M JIMENEZ IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON LYNN M JIMENEZ FOR PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND LETTERS TESTAMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF $465.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY LYNN M JIMENEZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • PETITION RE: PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY WITH FULL AUTHORIZATION TO ADMINISTER UNDER IAEA FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.