This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 08:07:06 (UTC).

MTR OF MARY F RESENDEZ

Case Summary

On 09/06/2016 MTR OF MARY F RESENDEZ was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0887

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MICHAEL AARON RESENDEZ

Decedent

MARY F RESENDEZ

Not Classified By Court

SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

DAVID M HUYNH

267 D Street

Upland, CA 91786

HUYNH, DAVID M

267 D Street

Upland, CA 91786

 

Court Documents

SUPPLEMENTAL TO PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND LETTERS TESTAMENTARY FILED. (IMAGED)

SUPPLEMENTAL TO PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND LETTERS TESTAMENTARY FILED. (IMAGED)

SUPPLEMENTAL TO PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND LETTERS TESTAMENTARY FILED. (IMAGED)

SUPPLEMENTAL TO PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND LETTERS TESTAMENTARY FILED. (IMAGED)

DECLARATION AND ORDER FOR FINAL DISCHARGE FILED.

DECLARATION AND ORDER FOR FINAL DISCHARGE FILED.; Minutes; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION - PETITION FOR WILL AND LETTERS TESTAMENTARY FILED 09/06/2016 OF MICHAEL RESENDEZ ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); DISPOSITION ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); ACTION - COMPLETE; VACATE HRFD HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 10/15/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S37P.

WAIVER OF NOTICE OF HRG OF APRIL RESENDEZ(CORALYN ROMONA FILED.

WAIVER OF NOTICE OF HRG OF APRIL RESENDEZ(CORALYN ROMONA FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 10/02/17 W/POS FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 10/02/17 W/POS FILED.

FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNTING REPORT FILED BY MICHAEL AARON RESENDEZ

FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNTING REPORT FILED BY MICHAEL AARON RESENDEZ

INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL: FINAL ILED.

INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL: FINAL ILED.

NOTICE TO DEPARMTNE OF HEALTH CARE SERVICES FILED BY MICHAEL AARON RESENDEZ.

NOTICE TO DEPARMTNE OF HEALTH CARE SERVICES FILED BY MICHAEL AARON RESENDEZ.

NOTICE OF FRANCHISE TAX BOARD FILED BY MICHAEL AARON RESENDEZ.

NOTICE OF FRANCHISE TAX BOARD FILED BY MICHAEL AARON RESENDEZ.

WAIVER OF NTC OF PROPOSED ACTION BY APRIL RESENDEZ FILED.

WAIVER OF NTC OF PROPOSED ACTION BY APRIL RESENDEZ FILED.

ORDER APPOINTING EXECUTOR, MICHAEL AARON RESENDEZ APPOINTED WITH FULL IAEA. BOND $75,000.00, B.M. GARVIN APPOINTED PROBATE REFEREE, FILED.

ORDER APPOINTING EXECUTOR, MICHAEL AARON RESENDEZ APPOINTED WITH FULL IAEA. BOND $75,000.00, B.M. GARVIN APPOINTED PROBATE REFEREE, FILED.

HRG OF 01/11/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 01/11/17 - PROBATE NOTES

WAIVER OF NOTICE OF HEARING BY APRIL RESENDEZ FILED.

WAIVER OF NOTICE OF HEARING BY APRIL RESENDEZ FILED.

HRG OF 11/16/16 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 11/16/16 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 11/16/16 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 11/16/16 - PROBATE NOTES

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY MICHAEL AARON RESENDEZ

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY MICHAEL AARON RESENDEZ

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

PETITION RE: PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY W/FULL IAEA FILED.

PETITION RE: PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY W/FULL IAEA FILED.

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2018
  • HEARING RE FINAL DISCHARGE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • ACCOUNTING REVIEW; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION AND ORDER FOR FINAL DISCHARGE FILED.; Minutes; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION - PETITION FOR WILL AND LETTERS TESTAMENTARY FILED 09/06/2016 OF MICHAEL RESENDEZ ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); DISPOSITION ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); ACTION - COMPLETE; VACATE HRFD HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 10/15/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S37P.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT RE: STATUTORY FEES AND COSTS ADVANCED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT RE: DISTRIBUTION BY BENEFICIARY (MICHAEL RESENDEZ) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER APPROVING FIRST & FINAL REPORT OF EXECUTOR FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON FIRST AND FINAL REPORT OF EXECUTOR RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF MICHAEL AARON RESENDEZ AND PETITION FOR ALLOWANCE OF FEES FILED.; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; TARA REILLY, JUDGE; CLERK: CHRISTINE SPENCER; COURT REPORTER KIM HORSTMEYER 11522; COURT ATTENDANT R KRETZMEIER; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY JOSPEH BORJAS PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; PROCEEDINGS:; REVIEW HEARING HELD; FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNTING APPROVED/GRANTED.; ORDER TO BE FILED; HEARINGS:; HEARING RE FINAL DISCHARGE SET FOR 10/15/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S37P.; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION: SUBSEQUENT PETITION BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); DISPOSITION SUBSEQUENT PETITION BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 10/02/17 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WAIVER OF NOTICE OF HRG OF APRIL RESENDEZ(CORALYN ROMONA FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 11/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 11/16/16 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 11/16/16 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY MICHAEL AARON RESENDEZ FOR FAX FILING NTC OF PTN TO ADMIN ESTATE; Minutes; Receipt: 160920-0174 $3.00; 160920-0174-VS Reference Number 023-0270087696

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY MICHAEL AARON RESENDEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY MICHAEL AARON RESENDEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2016
  • CONFIDENTIAL STATEMENT OF BIRTH DATE AND DRIVER'S LICENSE NUMBER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION RE: PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY W/FULL IAEA FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2016
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE); Minutes; Receipt: 160906-0902 $465.00; 160906-0902-CK Reference Number 3486183

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.