This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/11/2018 at 21:51:43 (UTC).

MTR OF MARGARET ADRIENNE THOMPSON

Case Summary

On 10/19/2017 MTR OF MARGARET ADRIENNE THOMPSON was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1025

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

TERI LYN PEREZ

Decedent

MARGARET ADRIENNE THOMPSON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ROBERT J SPITZ

204 North San Antonio Avenue

Ontario, CA 91762

 

Court Documents

NOTICE TO FRANCHISE TAX BOARD FILED BY TERI LYN PEREZ.

NOTICE TO FRANCHISE TAX BOARD FILED BY TERI LYN PEREZ.

NOTICE OF DEATH TO THE DEPARTMENT OF HEALTHCARE SERVICES FILED BY TERI LYN PEREZ.

NOTICE OF DEATH TO THE DEPARTMENT OF HEALTHCARE SERVICES FILED BY TERI LYN PEREZ.

LETTERS ISSUED ( OF ADMINISTRATION W/FULL IAEA)

LETTERS ISSUED ( OF ADMINISTRATION W/FULL IAEA)

ORDER APPOINTING ADMINISTRATOR, TERI LYN PEREZ APPOINTED WITH FULL IAEA. BOND NOT REQUIRED, B.M GARVIN APPOINTED PROBATE REFEREE, FILED.

ORDER APPOINTING ADMINISTRATOR, TERI LYN PEREZ APPOINTED WITH FULL IAEA. BOND NOT REQUIRED, B.M GARVIN APPOINTED PROBATE REFEREE, FILED.

HRG OF 01/16/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 01/16/18 - PROBATE NOTES

PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NTC OF PET. TO ADMINISTER 12/7, 12/14, 12/21/17 FILED.

PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NTC OF PET. TO ADMINISTER 12/7, 12/14, 12/21/17 FILED.

HRG OF 01/16/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 01/16/18 - PROBATE NOTES

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY TERI LYN PEREZ

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY TERI LYN PEREZ

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

PETITION RE: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION W/FULL IAEA FILED.

PETITION RE: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION W/FULL IAEA FILED.

PETITION RE: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION W/FULL IAEA FILED.

PETITION RE: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION W/FULL IAEA FILED.

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY TERI LYN PEREZ

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY TERI LYN PEREZ

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY TERI LYN PEREZ

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY TERI LYN PEREZ

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2019
  • ACCOUNTING REVIEW BY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL: CORRECTED ILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • SATISFACTION AND RELEASE OF CREDITORS CLAIM FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • SATISFACTION AND RELEASE OF CREDITORS CLAIM FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • CREDITORS CLAIM FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK. TOTAL AMOUNT OF CLAIM IS $7,551.75.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO FRANCHISE TAX BOARD FILED BY TERI LYN PEREZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF DEATH TO THE DEPARTMENT OF HEALTHCARE SERVICES FILED BY TERI LYN PEREZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY TERI LYN PEREZ FOR 1 CC LETTERS; Minutes; Receipt: 180116-0198 $25.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • LETTERS ISSUED ( OF ADMINISTRATION W/FULL IAEA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • CASE ADDED TO COURT SUPERVISION (PROBATE).

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 01/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 01/16/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY TERI LYN PEREZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • PROPOSED LETTERS RECEIVED (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • CONFIDENTIAL STATEMENT OF BIRTH DATE AND DRIVER'S LICENSE NUMBER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON APPOINTING ADMINISTRATOR RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION RE: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION W/FULL IAEA FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY TERI LYN PEREZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S36P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE); Minutes; Receipt: 171020-0685 $465.00; 171020-0685-CK Reference Number 1779/448114

    Read MoreRead Less