This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/13/2018 at 01:59:02 (UTC).

MTR OF MANSIE BOOKER, JR.

Case Summary

On 11/01/2016 MTR OF MANSIE BOOKER, JR was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1094

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KIPPY SHANTEL KRUCKENBERG

Decedent

MANSIE BOOKER JR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

WILSON, CRAIG E

215 North D Street First Floor

San Bernardino, CA 92401-1712

 

Court Documents

LETTERS ISSUED ( EXECUTOR)

LETTERS ISSUED ( EXECUTOR)

LETTERS ISSUED ( EXECUTOR)

LETTERS ISSUED ( EXECUTOR)

NOTICE OF PROPOSED ACTION

NOTICE OF PROPOSED ACTION

HRG OF 04/10/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 04/10/18 - PROBATE NOTES

INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL: FINAL ILED.

INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL: FINAL ILED.

HRG OF 03/14/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 03/14/18 - PROBATE NOTES

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 04/10/18 FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 04/10/18 FILED.

HRG OF 03/14/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 03/14/18 - PROBATE NOTES

NOTICE TO FILE OR PRESENT CLAIMS FILED BY KIPPY SHANTEL KRUCKENBERG.

NOTICE TO FILE OR PRESENT CLAIMS FILED BY KIPPY SHANTEL KRUCKENBERG.

HRG OF 01/04/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 01/04/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 01/04/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 01/04/17 - PROBATE NOTES

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY KIPPY SHANTEL KRUCKENBERG

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY KIPPY SHANTEL KRUCKENBERG

HRG OF 01/04/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 01/04/17 - PROBATE NOTES

PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED.

PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED.

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY KIPPY SHANTEL KRUCKENBERG

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY KIPPY SHANTEL KRUCKENBERG

RCPT FOR WILL LODGED WITH COURT PLACED IN FILE

RCPT FOR WILL LODGED WITH COURT PLACED IN FILE

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

PETITION RE: PROBATE OF WILL & FOR LTRS TESTAMENTARY W/ FULL IAEA FILED.

PETITION RE: PROBATE OF WILL & FOR LTRS TESTAMENTARY W/ FULL IAEA FILED.

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2019
  • ACCOUNTING REVIEW BY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE-NOTICE OF PROPOSED ACTION OF JUNE POWELL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER APPROVING REPORT OF STATUS OF ADMINISTRATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • PROBATE STATUS REPORT FILED.; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; JAMES MICHAEL WELCH, JUDGE; CLERK: SHANNON PRATT; COURT REPORTER CATHY ALBRITTON 7137; COURT ATTENDANT D NEWCOMB; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY ZACHARY HAGENBUCH PRESENT FOR KIPPY KRUCKENBERG.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); STATUS REPORT APPROVED; ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE.; HEARINGS:; ACCOUNTING REVIEW SET FOR 04/16/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S36P.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY KIPPY SHANTEL KRUCKENBERG FOR CC OF LTRS; Minutes; Receipt: 180405-0474 $25.50; 180405-0474-CK Reference Number 612435

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF PROPOSED ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 04/10/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL: FINAL ILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 04/10/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • ACCOUNTING REVIEW BY; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 11/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY KIPPY SHANTEL KRUCKENBERG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • ORIGINAL WILL LODGED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • RCPT FOR WILL LODGED WITH COURT PLACED IN FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON APPOINTING EXECUTOR RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S36P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • CONFIDENTIAL STATEMENT OF BIRTH DATE AND DRIVER'S LICENSE NUMBER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION RE: PROBATE OF WILL & FOR LTRS TESTAMENTARY W/ FULL IAEA FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY KIPPY SHANTEL KRUCKENBERG FOR COPIES; Minutes; Receipt: 161101-0485 $2.00; 161101-0485-CK Reference Number 454633

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE); Minutes; Receipt: 161101-0483 $465.00; 161101-0483-CK Reference Number 72332

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.