This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/11/2018 at 13:05:13 (UTC).

MTR OF MALCOLM E SILVERTHORN

Case Summary

On 02/06/2017 MTR OF MALCOLM E SILVERTHORN was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0108

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

VIRGINIA SILVERTHORN

Decedent

MALCOLM E SILVERTHORN

Not Classified By Court

SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BORGIA, KRISTINE M

 

Court Documents

RECEIPT FOR WILL LODGED WITH COURT PLACED IN FILE

RECEIPT FOR WILL LODGED WITH COURT PLACED IN FILE

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY VIRGINIA SILVERTHORN

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY VIRGINIA SILVERTHORN

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

RECEIPT FOR WILL LODGED WITH COURT PLACED IN FILE

RECEIPT FOR WILL LODGED WITH COURT PLACED IN FILE

PETITION RE: FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY W/FULL IAEA FILED.

PETITION RE: FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY W/FULL IAEA FILED.

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY VIRGINIA SILVERTHORN

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY VIRGINIA SILVERTHORN

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2019
  • HEARING RE FINAL DISCHARGE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • ACCOUNTING REVIEW BY; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • DECLARATION AND ORDER FOR FINAL DISCHARGE FILED.; Minutes; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION - ACCOUNTING REVIEW FILED 11/27/2017 OF VIRGINIA SILVERTHORN ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); DISPOSITION ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); CASE COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • RECEIPT RE: ATTORNEY FEES FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON EXPARET PET FOR FINAL DISCHARGE RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • RECEIPT FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION RECEIVED FROM VIRGINIA SILVERTHORN FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY VIRGINIA SILVERTHORN FOR CERTIFIED COPY; Minutes; Receipt: 180308-0192 $26.50; 180308-0192-VS Reference Number 031-0092747166

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • ORDER ON FINAL REPORT OF EXECUTOR, AND ACCOUNT AND PETIT ION FOR ITS SETTLEMENT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF VIRGINIA SILVERTHORN AND PETITION FOR ALLOWANCE OF FEES FILED.; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; TARA REILLY, JUDGE; CLERK: ELIZABETH DEATHERAGE; COURT REPORTER KIM HORSTMEYER 11522; COURT ATTENDANT R KRETZMEIER; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY KRISTINE BORGIA PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNTING APPROVED/GRANTED.; ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE.; HEARINGS:; HEARING RE FINAL DISCHARGE SET FOR 03/14/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S37P.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • HRG OF 03/08/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 02/16/2017
  • PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NTC OF PET TO ADMINISTR 02/09,16,23/17 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT FOR WILL LODGED WITH COURT PLACED IN FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY VIRGINIA SILVERTHORN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • CONFIDENTIAL STATEMENT OF BIRTH DATE AND DRIVER'S LICENSE NUMBER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON LETTERS TESTAMENTARY W/FULL IAEA BOND NOT RQURD RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • ORIGINAL WILL LODGED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S37P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION RE: FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY W/FULL IAEA FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE); Minutes; Receipt: 170206-0488 $465.00; 170206-0488-CK Reference Number 2337

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.