This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/13/2018 at 00:23:01 (UTC).

MTR OF MADELYN MAHFOOD

Case Summary

On 09/15/2016 MTR OF MADELYN MAHFOOD was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0928

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

JAMES E MAHFOOD

Laguna Hills, CA 92653

BARBARA COWARD

Decedent

MADELYN MAHFOOD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MAHFOOD, JAMES E

25283 Cabot Road Suite 116

Laguna Hills, CA 92653

 

Court Documents

ORDER DETERMINING SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY FILED.

ORDER DETERMINING SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY FILED.

HRG OF 09/13/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 09/13/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 09/13/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 09/13/17 - PROBATE NOTES

AMENDED PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY FILED.

AMENDED PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY FILED.

HRG OF 06/29/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 06/29/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 06/29/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 06/29/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 04/24/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 04/24/17 - PROBATE NOTES

AMENDED PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY FILED.

AMENDED PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY FILED.

HRG OF 04/24/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 04/24/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 02/06/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 02/06/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 02/06/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 02/06/17 - PROBATE NOTES

WAIVER OF BOND FILED.

WAIVER OF BOND FILED.

PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY FILED.

PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY FILED.

PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY FILED.

PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY FILED.

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2018
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 180206-0847 $25.50; 180206-0847-CK Reference Number 3598412

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER DETERMINING SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • HEARING RE: AMENDED PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL P; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; H. RONALD DOMNITZ, JUDGE; CLERK: CHRISTINE SPENCER; COURT REPORTER KIM HORSTMEYER 11522; COURT ATTENDANT R KRETZMEIER; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY JAMES MAHFOOD MAKES A TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY FILED 09/15/2016 OF JAMES MAHFOOD IS GRANTED; ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE.; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION: SUBSEQUENT PETITION BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); DISPOSITION SUBSEQUENT PETITION BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY; Disposition: Off Calendar; Minutes; OFF-CALENDAR. REASON: AMENDED PETITION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 09/13/17 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 09/13/17 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY; Disposition: Off Calendar; Minutes; OFF-CALENDAR. REASON: DUPLICATE SETTING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; TARA REILLY, JUDGE; CLERK: TRACY MORRIS; COURT REPORTER KIM HORSTMEYER 11522; COURT ATTENDANT R KRETZMEIER; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY JAMES E. MAHFOOD (AFTER HEARING) PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF COURT.; REASON: TO TRAIL HEARING ALREADY SET FOR 09/13/17; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 09/13/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S37P.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON DETERMINING SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDED PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 02/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 02/06/17 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 02/06/17 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; TARA REILLY, JUDGE; CLERK: ELIZABETH DEATHERAGE; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; COURT ATTENDANT R KRETZMEIER; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY JAMES MAHFOOD MAKES A TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF COUNSEL.; REASON: TO CLEAR PROBATE NOTES; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 02/06/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S37P.; NOTICE TO BE GIVEN BY MR. MAHFOOD.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON DETERMINING SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY JAMES E MAHFOOD FOR FAX FILING, COPY, RETURN ENVELOPE/POSTAGE; Minutes; Receipt: 160928-0306 $3.19; 160928-0306-MC Reference Number 023-0270889073

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • WAIVER OF BOND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY JAMES E MAHFOOD FOR COPIES, POSTAGE AND ENVELOPE; Minutes; Receipt: 160916-0822 $1.69; 160916-0822-MC Reference Number 023-0269808214

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY JAMES E MAHFOOD FOR FAX FILING OF PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION; Minutes; Receipt: 160916-0821 $9.00; 160916-0821-MC Reference Number 023-0269808214

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE); Minutes; Receipt: 160916-0817 $465.00; 160916-0817-MC Reference Number 023-0269808214

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.