This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/13/2018 at 02:49:02 (UTC).

MTR OF LUIS ROMERO

Case Summary

On 11/21/2016 MTR OF LUIS ROMERO was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1167

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CATALINA PEDRAZA DE ROMERO

Decedent

LUIS ROMERO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

COLEMAN, ANGEL

4075 Eleventh Street #8

Riverside, CA 92501

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION OF ROBERT ROMERO FILED

DECLARATION OF ROBERT ROMERO FILED

DECLARATION OF JOSE ROMERO FILED

DECLARATION OF JOSE ROMERO FILED

SPOUSAL OR DOMESTIC PARTNER PROPERTY ORDER.

SPOUSAL OR DOMESTIC PARTNER PROPERTY ORDER.

HRG OF 08/22/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 08/22/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 08/22/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 08/22/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 06/27/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 06/27/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 06/27/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 06/27/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 06/27/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 06/27/17 - PROBATE NOTES

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 04/24/2017 FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 04/24/2017 FILED.

HRG OF 04/24/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 04/24/17 - PROBATE NOTES

AMENDED SPOUSAL PROPERTY PETITION FILED.

AMENDED SPOUSAL PROPERTY PETITION FILED.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING PRO/PER WITH ANGEL COLEMAN AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR CATALINA PEDRAZA DE ROMERO.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING PRO/PER WITH ANGEL COLEMAN AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR CATALINA PEDRAZA DE ROMERO.

HRG OF 04/24/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 04/24/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 02/06/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 02/06/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 02/06/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 02/06/17 - PROBATE NOTES

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

SPOUSAL/DOMESTIC PARTNER PROPERTY PETITION FILED.

SPOUSAL/DOMESTIC PARTNER PROPERTY PETITION FILED.

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF ROBERT ROMERO FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF JOSE ROMERO FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SPOUSAL OR DOMESTIC PARTNER PROPERTY ORDER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • HEARING RE: AMENDED SPOUSAL PROPERTY PETITION; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; TARA REILLY, JUDGE; CLERK: ELIZABETH DEATHERAGE; COURT REPORTER KIM HORSTMEYER 11522; COURT ATTENDANT D RICE; APPEARANCES:; CATALINA ROMERO PRESENT.; ATTORNEY ANGEL COLEMAN PRESENT FOR CATALINA ROMERO.; ROBERTO ROMERO PRESENT.; JOSE ROMERO PRESENT.; CERTIFIED INTERPRETER JO ANN GUTIERREZ BEJAR # 301585 IS PRESENT TO INTERPRET SPANISH/ENGLISH FOR CATALINA, ROBERTO AND JOSE ROMERO. INTERPRETER'S JUDICIAL COUNCIL BADGE NUMBER HAS BEEN VALIDATED AND IDENTIFICATION HAS BEEN VERIFIED.; INTERPRETER OATH HAS BEEN ADMINISTERED AND PLACED ON FILE WITH THE COURT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); DECLARATIONS REGARDING ASSIGNMENT OF INTEREST IN THE PROPERTY ACCEPTED BY THE COURT.; SPOUSAL PROPERTY PETITION FILED 11/21/2016 OF CATALINA PEDRAZA DE ROMERO IS GRANTED; ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE.; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION - SPOUSAL PROPERTY PETITION FILED 11/21/2016 OF CATALINA PEDRAZA DE ROMERO ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); DISPOSITION ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 08/22/17 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 08/22/17 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • HEARING RE: AMENDED SPOUSAL PROPERTY PETITION; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; TARA REILLY, JUDGE; CLERK: ELIZABETH DEATHERAGE; COURT REPORTER KIM HORSTMEYER 11522; COURT ATTENDANT R KRETZMEIER; APPEARANCES:; CATALINA PEDRAZA DE ROMERO PRESENT.; CERTIFIED INTERPRETER SYSYA MADRIGAL # 301090 IS PRESENT TO INTERPRET SPANISH/ENGLISH FOR PETITIONER. INTERPRETER'S JUDICIAL COUNCIL BADGE NUMBER HAS BEEN VALIDATED AND IDENTIFICATION HAS BEEN VERIFIED.; INTERPRETER OATH HAS BEEN ADMINISTERED AND PLACED ON FILE WITH THE COURT.; ATTORNEY ANGEL COLEMAN PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); THE COURT TENTIVELY DENIES PETITION.; MATTER CONTINUED FOR SONS TO FILE WAIVERS AND DISCLAIMERS.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 08/22/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S37P.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • SPOUSAL PROPERTY PETITION HEARING.; Disposition: Off Calendar; Minutes; OFF-CALENDAR. REASON: AMENDED PETITION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 06/27/17 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 06/27/17 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 04/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 04/24/17 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • SPOUSAL PROPERTY PETITION HEARING.; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; STANFORD E. REICHERT, JUDGE; CLERK: ELIZABETH DEATHERAGE; COURT REPORTER LINDY CASTRO 13180; COURT ATTENDANT C LEPE; APPEARANCES:; CATALINA ROMERO PRESENT.; CERTIFIED INTERPRETER ANTONIO VALENCIA # 301239 IS PRESENT TO INTERPRET SPANISH/ENGLISH FOR CATALINA ROMERO. INTERPRETER'S JUDICIAL COUNCIL BADGE NUMBER HAS BEEN VALIDATED AND IDENTIFICATION HAS BEEN VERIFIED.; INTERPRETER OATH HAS BEEN ADMINISTERED AND PLACED ON FILE WITH THE COURT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF COURT.; REASON: TO CLEAR PROBATE NOTES/VERIFIED SUPPLEMENT TO; BE FILED.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 04/24/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S37P.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 02/06/17 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 02/06/17 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY CATALINA PEDRAZA DE ROMERO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY CATALINA PEDRAZA DE ROMERO IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON CATALINA PEDRAZA DE ROMERO FOR SPOUSAL PROPERTY PETITION IN THE AMOUNT OF $465.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SPOUSAL/DOMESTIC PARTNER PROPERTY PETITION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.