This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 12/15/2018 at 08:18:17 (UTC).

MTR OF KIRK LOTT

Case Summary

On 10/25/2017 MTR OF KIRK LOTT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1064

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ANGELA LOTT

Decedent

KIRK LOTT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

VINCENT W. DAVIS &ASSOCIATES

150 N Santa Anita Ave,Ste 200

Arcadia, CA 91006

 

Court Documents

LETTERS ISSUED ( ADMINISTRATOR)

LETTERS ISSUED ( ADMINISTRATOR)

ORDER APPOINTING ADMINISTRATOR, ANGELA LOTT APPOINTED WITH FULL IAEA. BOND NOT REQUIRED, MANISHA HUNTER APPOINTED PROBATE REFEREE, FILED.

ORDER APPOINTING ADMINISTRATOR, ANGELA LOTT APPOINTED WITH FULL IAEA. BOND NOT REQUIRED, MANISHA HUNTER APPOINTED PROBATE REFEREE, FILED.

CREDITORS CLAIM FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK. TOTAL AMOUNT OF CLAIM IS $3,443.40.

CREDITORS CLAIM FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK. TOTAL AMOUNT OF CLAIM IS $3,443.40.

HRG OF 01/17/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 01/17/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 01/17/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 01/17/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 01/17/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 01/17/18 - PROBATE NOTES

PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED.

PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 01/17/18 FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 01/17/18 FILED.

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY ANGELA LOTT

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY ANGELA LOTT

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

PETITION RE: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION W/FULL IAEA FILED.

PETITION RE: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION W/FULL IAEA FILED.

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY ANGELA LOTT

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY ANGELA LOTT

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2019
  • ACCOUNTING REVIEW BY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ANGELA LOTT FOR CC OF ORDR & LTRS; Minutes; Receipt: 180928-0485 $51.00; 180928-0485-DB Reference Number 031-0152072983

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • CASE ADDED TO COURT SUPERVISION (PROBATE).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • LETTERS ISSUED ( ADMINISTRATOR)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER APPOINTING ADMINISTRATOR, ANGELA LOTT APPOINTED WITH FULL IAEA. BOND NOT REQUIRED, MANISHA HUNTER APPOINTED PROBATE REFEREE, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON FOR PROBATE RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • PROPOSED LETTERS RECEIVED (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 180904-0380 $1.00; 180904-0380-DB Reference Number 031-0143858195

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CREDITORS CLAIM FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK. TOTAL AMOUNT OF CLAIM IS $3,443.40.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • HEARING RE: PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMIN. W/ FULL AUTHORITY UNDER IAEA.; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; JAMES MICHAEL WELCH, JUDGE; CLERK: RACHELE ANDREWS; COURT REPORTER CARRIE LANE 8882; COURT ATTENDANT D NEWCOMB; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY VINCENT DAVIS PRESENT FOR ANGELA LOTT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); PETITION FOR PROBATE FILED 10/25/2017 OF ANGELA LOTT IS GRANTED; ANGELA LOTT IS/ARE APPOINTED PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE: ADMINISTRATOR; IS AUTHORIZED TO ADMINISTER ESTATE UNDER IAEA WITH FULL POWERS.; NO BOND IS REQUIRED.; COUNSEL TO SUBMIT ORDER.; HEARINGS:; ACCOUNTING REVIEW SET FOR 03/27/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S36P.; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION - PETITION FOR PROBATE FILED 10/25/2017 OF ANGELA LOTT ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); DISPOSITION ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 11/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON 01/17/18 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY ANGELA LOTT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION RE: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION W/FULL IAEA FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S36P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • PROPOSED LETTERS RECEIVED (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY ANGELA LOTT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • CONFIDENTIAL STATEMENT OF BIRTH DATE AND DRIVER'S LICENSE NUMBER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE); Minutes; Receipt: 171025-0188 $465.00; 171025-0188-CK Reference Number 3533

    Read MoreRead Less