This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/13/2018 at 01:59:46 (UTC).

MTR OF KENNETH GENE CROSSWHITE JR

Case Summary

On 11/01/2016 MTR OF KENNETH GENE CROSSWHITE JR was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1096

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KENNETH GENE CROSSWHITE III

Decedent

KENNETH GENE CROSSWHITE JR

 

Court Documents

INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL: FINAL ILED.

INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL: FINAL ILED.

DECLARATION OF KENNETH CROSSWHITE FILED

DECLARATION OF KENNETH CROSSWHITE FILED

ORDER DETERMINING SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY FILED.

ORDER DETERMINING SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY FILED.

HRG OF 05/18/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 05/18/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 05/18/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 05/18/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 03/30/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 03/30/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 03/30/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 03/30/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 02/23/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 02/23/17 - PROBATE NOTES

AMENDED PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY AND PERSONAL PROPERTY FILED.

AMENDED PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY AND PERSONAL PROPERTY FILED.

HRG OF 02/23/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 02/23/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 01/05/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 01/05/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 01/05/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 01/05/17 - PROBATE NOTES

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY FILED.

PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY FILED.

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL: FINAL ILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF KENNETH CROSSWHITE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER DETERMINING SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • PETITION FOR (AMENDED) PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; CYNTHIA A LUDVIGSEN, JUDGE; CLERK: ILAYALI WADE; COURT REPORTER CATHY ALBRITTON 7137; COURT ATTENDANT D NEWCOMB; APPEARANCES:; KENNETH GENE CROSSWHITE III PRESENT.; ASHIA CROSSWHITE PRESENT.; CANDICE CROSSWHITE PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); (MATTER PLACED ON SECOND CALL); THE COURT ALLOWS PETITIONERS TIME TO COMPLETE ALL NECESSARY FORMS STATED ON THE PROBATE NOTES.; THE COURT ACCEPTS AND DEEMS INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL AND DECLARATION FORMS FILED THIS DATE.; PETITIONER REPRESENTS THERE IS NO PERSONAL PROPERTY ONLY REAL PROPERTY.; PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY FILED 11/01/2016 OF KENNETH CROSSWHITE IS GRANTED; ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE.; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION - PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY FILED 11/01/2016 OF KENNETH CROSSWHITE ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); DISPOSITION ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 05/18/17 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 05/18/17 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • PETITION FOR (AMENDED) PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; CYNTHIA A LUDVIGSEN, JUDGE; CLERK: RACHELE ANDREWS; COURT REPORTER CATHY ALBRITTON 7137; COURT ATTENDANT D NEWCOMB; APPEARANCES:; KENNETH CROSSWHITE III PRESENT IN PRO PER.; ASHIA CROSSWHITE PRESENT IN PRO PER.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); TO FILE A SUPPLEMENT TO AMENDED PETITION TO CLEAR PROBATE NOTES.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 05/18/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S36P.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 03/30/17 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 03/30/17 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 02/23/17 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 12/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 01/05/17 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY KENNETH GENE CROSSWHITE III IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON KENNETH GENE CROSSWHITE III FOR PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY IN THE AMOUNT OF $465.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY KENNETH GENE CROSSWHITE III.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S36P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON DETERMINING SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.