This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/13/2018 at 01:25:03 (UTC).

MTR OF KAREN LYNN HALL

Case Summary

On 10/14/2016 MTR OF KAREN LYNN HALL was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1029

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KEENAN MICHAEL HALL

Decedent

KAREN LYNN HALL

Not Classified By Court

SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY

DANIELLE CHERISE HALL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

DUANE P BOOTH

555 North "D" Street #110

San Bernardino, CA 92401

 

Court Documents

ORDER SETTLING FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNTING AND REPORT OF ADMINISTRATOR FILED.

ORDER SETTLING FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNTING AND REPORT OF ADMINISTRATOR FILED.

PROOF OF SUBSCRIBING WITNESS FILED BY DONALD DENNIS JOINER

PROOF OF SUBSCRIBING WITNESS FILED BY DONALD DENNIS JOINER

PROOF OF SUBSCRIBING WITNESS FILED BY DONALD DENNIS JOINER

PROOF OF SUBSCRIBING WITNESS FILED BY DONALD DENNIS JOINER

PROOF OF SUBSCRIBING WITNESS FILED BY DONALD DENNIS JOINER

PROOF OF SUBSCRIBING WITNESS FILED BY DONALD DENNIS JOINER

PROOF OF SUBSCRIBING WITNESS FILED BY DONALD DENNIS JOINER

PROOF OF SUBSCRIBING WITNESS FILED BY DONALD DENNIS JOINER

HRG OF 12/20/16 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 12/20/16 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 12/20/16 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 12/20/16 - PROBATE NOTES

PROOF OF HOLOGRAPHIC WILL FILED.

PROOF OF HOLOGRAPHIC WILL FILED.

PROOF OF HOLOGRAPHIC WILL FILED.

PROOF OF HOLOGRAPHIC WILL FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY KEENAN MICHAEL HALL.

NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY KEENAN MICHAEL HALL.

ORDER ON EX PARTE MOTION TO REDUCE BOND FILED

ORDER ON EX PARTE MOTION TO REDUCE BOND FILED

WITHDRAWAL OF REQUEST FOR SPECIAL NOTICE BY FRANCHISE TAX BOARD FILED.

WITHDRAWAL OF REQUEST FOR SPECIAL NOTICE BY FRANCHISE TAX BOARD FILED.

WITHDRAWAL OF CLAIM FOR PERSONAL INCOME TAX FILED.

WITHDRAWAL OF CLAIM FOR PERSONAL INCOME TAX FILED.

WITHDRAWAL OF REQUEST FOR SPECIAL NOTICE FILED.

WITHDRAWAL OF REQUEST FOR SPECIAL NOTICE FILED.

NOTICE TO FRANCHISE TAX BOARD OF DECEDENTS DEATH FILED BY KEENAN MICHAEL HALL.

NOTICE TO FRANCHISE TAX BOARD OF DECEDENTS DEATH FILED BY KEENAN MICHAEL HALL.

LETTERS ISSUED ( ADMINISTRATION WITH WILL ANNEXED)

LETTERS ISSUED ( ADMINISTRATION WITH WILL ANNEXED)

PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NOTICE OF PETIITON TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED.

PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NOTICE OF PETIITON TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED.

PETITION RE: FOR PROBATE OW WILL AND FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION WITH WILL ANNEXED FULL IAEA FILED.

PETITION RE: FOR PROBATE OW WILL AND FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION WITH WILL ANNEXED FULL IAEA FILED.

55 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2019
  • HEARING RE FINAL DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • HEARING RE: PETITION FOR WILL CONTEST FILED BY DANEILLE HALL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • HEARING RE: PETITION FOR WILL CONTEST FILED BY DANEILLE HALL; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; TARA REILLY, JUDGE; CLERK: CHRISTINE SPENCER; COURT REPORTER KIM HORSTMEYER 11522; COURT ATTENDANT R KRETZMEIER; APPEARANCES:; DANIELLE CHERISE HALL APPEARS BY COURT CALL.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF THE COURT.; REASON: WILL IS CONTESTED/NTC OF HRG/SUMMONS & COMPL; TO BE FILED BY DANIELLE HALL; COUNSEL INTENDS TO FILE AN MSJ; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 11/28/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S37P.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 08/13/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 08/13/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 08/13/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUPP DECLARATION OF DUANE P BOOTH FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON 08/13/18 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON ALLOWING EXTRAORDINARY ATTYS COMPENSATION RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY KEENAN MICHAEL HALL FOR OBJECTION TO PETITION FOR WILL CONTEST; Minutes; Receipt: 180702-0173 $435.00; 180702-0173-MC Reference Number 031-0127086527

    Read MoreRead Less
74 More Docket Entries
  • 10/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION RE: FOR PROBATE OW WILL AND FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION WITH WILL ANNEXED FULL IAEA FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S37P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2016
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON FOR PROBATE ADMINISTRATOR WITH WILL ANNEXED RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY KEENAN MICHAEL HALL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2016
  • PROPOSED LETTERS RECEIVED (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2016
  • CONFIDENTIAL STATEMENT OF BIRTH DATE AND DRIVER'S LICENSE NUMBER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT FOR WILL LODGED WITH COURT PLACED IN FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2016
  • ORIGINAL WILL LODGED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2016
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE); Minutes; Receipt: 161014-0709 $465.00; 161014-0709-CK Reference Number 5511

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.