This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/11/2018 at 22:13:04 (UTC).

MTR OF JUDITH HOPE ULERY

Case Summary

On 10/31/2017 MTR OF JUDITH HOPE ULERY was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1083

  • Filing Date:

    10/31/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MEREDITH RYAN

Decedent

JUDITH HOPE ULERY

Others

CALIFORNIA VICTIM COMPENSATIONBOARD

P.O Box 1348

Sacramento, CA 95812-1348

DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH CARE SERVICES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

FULLERTON LEMANN SCHAEFER & DOMINICK

215 North D Street First Floor

San Bernardino, CA 924011712

Other Attorney

CALIFORNIA VICTIM COMPENSATIONBOARD

P.O Box 1348

Sacramento, CA 95812-1348

 

Court Documents

LETTERS ISSUED ( ADMINISTRATION)

LETTERS ISSUED ( ADMINISTRATION)

ORDER APPOINTING ADMINISTRATOR, MEREDITH RYAN APPOINTED WITH FULL IAEA. BOND FIXED AT $200,000.00, PATRICK B WRIGHT APPOINTED PROBATE REFEREE, FILED.

ORDER APPOINTING ADMINISTRATOR, MEREDITH RYAN APPOINTED WITH FULL IAEA. BOND FIXED AT $200,000.00, PATRICK B WRIGHT APPOINTED PROBATE REFEREE, FILED.

SURETY BOND ISSUED 1/10/18 IN THE AMT OF $200,000.00 BY LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY FILED.

SURETY BOND ISSUED 1/10/18 IN THE AMT OF $200,000.00 BY LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY FILED.

HRG OF 02/15/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 02/15/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 02/15/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 02/15/18 - PROBATE NOTES

REQUEST FOR SPECIAL NOTICE BY CALIFORNIA VICTIM COMPENSATION BOARD FILED.

REQUEST FOR SPECIAL NOTICE BY CALIFORNIA VICTIM COMPENSATION BOARD FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF DECLARATION, PROOF OF SERVICE, REQUEST FOR ETC BY MAIL ON 01/17/18 AS TO THOMAS W. DOMINICK, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF DECLARATION, PROOF OF SERVICE, REQUEST FOR ETC BY MAIL ON 01/17/18 AS TO THOMAS W. DOMINICK, FILED.

DECLARATION OF P. BELLIVEAU, PROBATE ANALYST FILED

DECLARATION OF P. BELLIVEAU, PROBATE ANALYST FILED

PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NTC. OF PET. TO ADMINISTER 11/8, 11/10, 11/15/17 FILED.

PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NTC. OF PET. TO ADMINISTER 11/8, 11/10, 11/15/17 FILED.

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY MEREDITH RYAN

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY MEREDITH RYAN

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY MEREDITH RYAN

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY MEREDITH RYAN

PETITION RE: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION W/FULL IAEA FILED.

PETITION RE: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION W/FULL IAEA FILED.

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2019
  • ACCOUNTING REVIEW BY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • DISMISSAL OF CREDITORS CLAIM FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • WITHDRAWAL OF REQUEST FOR SPECIAL NOTICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • ON PETITION FOR PROBATE FILED 10/31/2017 OF MEREDITH RYAN, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH CARE SERVICES REMOVED AS A PARTY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL: REAPPRAISAL FOR SALE ILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • REQUEST FOR SPECIAL NOTICE BY DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH CARE SERVICES FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • ON THE PETITION FOR PROBATE FILED 10/31/2017 OF MEREDITH RYAN, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH CARE SERVICES IS ADDED AS A THIRD PARTY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • CREDITORS CLAIM FILED BY DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH CARE SERVICES. TOTAL AMOUNT OF CLAIM IS $128,776.08.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • NOTICE OF PROPOSED ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL: FINAL ILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 11/17/2017
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 171227-0177 $2.00; 171227-0177-MC Reference Number 031-0071696103

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY MEREDITH RYAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S35P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON APPOINTING ADMINISTRATOR RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • PROPOSED LETTERS RECEIVED (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY MEREDITH RYAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • CONFIDENTIAL STATEMENT OF BIRTH DATE AND DRIVER'S LICENSE NUMBER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION RE: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION W/FULL IAEA FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE); Minutes; Receipt: 171031-0033 $465.00; 171031-0033-CK Reference Number 74731

    Read MoreRead Less