This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/13/2018 at 01:51:20 (UTC).

MTR OF IRIS L CALLOWAY

Case Summary

On 10/27/2016 MTR OF IRIS L CALLOWAY was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1082

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MARSHA D CALLOWAY

Decedent

IRIS L CALLOWAY

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF NON-PAYMENT OF STATUTORY FEES AND EXPENSES BY BURDETTE M GARVIN FILED.

NOTICE OF NON-PAYMENT OF STATUTORY FEES AND EXPENSES BY BURDETTE M GARVIN FILED.

HRG OF 04/27/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 04/27/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 04/27/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 04/27/17 - PROBATE NOTES

03/09/17 MINUTE ORDER MAILING COVERSHEET (IMAGED)

03/09/17 MINUTE ORDER MAILING COVERSHEET (IMAGED)

HRG OF 03/09/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 03/09/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 03/09/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 03/09/17 - PROBATE NOTES

MAILING COVER SHEET OF 12/22/16 MINUTE ORDER (IMAGED)

MAILING COVER SHEET OF 12/22/16 MINUTE ORDER (IMAGED)

HRG OF 12/22/16 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 12/22/16 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 12/22/16 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 12/22/16 - PROBATE NOTES

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY MARSHA D CALLOWAY

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY MARSHA D CALLOWAY

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

PETITION RE: LTRS OF ADMINISTRATION W/FULL IAEA FILED.

PETITION RE: LTRS OF ADMINISTRATION W/FULL IAEA FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF NON-PAYMENT OF STATUTORY FEES AND EXPENSES BY BURDETTE M GARVIN FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • PETITION FOR LTRS OF ADMINISTRATION W/FULL IAEA; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; STANFORD E. REICHERT, JUDGE; CLERK: TIFFANY KRETZMEIER; COURT REPORTER LINDY CASTRO 13180; COURT ATTENDANT D MORENO; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); PETITION IS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE AS PETITIONER FAILED TO APPEAR AND FAILED TO CLEAR; PROBATE NOTES.; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); DISPOSITION ENTRY COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • HEARING RE: OSC RE DISMISSAL OF PETITION FOR LETTERS; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; STANFORD E. REICHERT, JUDGE; CLERK: TIFFANY KRETZMEIER; COURT REPORTER LINDY CASTRO 13180; COURT ATTENDANT D MORENO; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); PETITION IS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE; ; CASE CLOSED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 04/27/17 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 04/27/17 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • 03/09/17 MINUTE ORDER MAILING COVERSHEET (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • PETITION FOR LTRS OF ADMINISTRATION W/FULL IAEA; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; STANFORD E. REICHERT, JUDGE; CLERK: TIFFANY KRETZMEIER; COURT REPORTER LINDY CASTRO 13180; COURT ATTENDANT D MORENO; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); COURT CONTINUES HEARING AND SETS OSC RE DISMISSAL- COURT NOTES THAT IF PETITIONER DOES; NOT APPEAR AT NEXT HEARING, OR HAVE ALL PROBATE NOTES CLEARED, COURT WILL DISMISS PETITION AT; NEXT HEARING DATE.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 04/27/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S35P.; HEARING RE: OSC RE DISMISSAL OF PETITION FOR LETTERS SET FOR 04/27/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S35P.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL 03/09/17 MINUTE ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 03/09/17 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 03/09/17 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MAILING COVER SHEET OF 12/22/16 MINUTE ORDER (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 10/27/2016
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON MARSHA D CALLOWAY FOR PET FOR LTRS OF ADMIN IN THE AMOUNT OF $465.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S35P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY MARSHA D CALLOWAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • CONFIDENTIAL STATEMENT OF BIRTH DATE AND DRIVER'S LICENSE NUMBER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON ORDR FOR PROBATE RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • PROPOSED LETTERS RECEIVED (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY MARSHA D CALLOWAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION RE: LTRS OF ADMINISTRATION W/FULL IAEA FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.