This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/11/2018 at 22:12:43 (UTC).

MTR OF FRANCES DODOTHY DAVIS

Case Summary

On 10/30/2017 MTR OF FRANCES DODOTHY DAVIS was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1081

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CAROLYN TOSHA

Decedent

FRANCES DOROTHY DAVIS

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (PROBATE); DISPOSITION ENTRY OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (PROBATE); CASE COMPLETE

PETITION RE: FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION W/FULL IAEA FILED.

PETITION RE: FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION W/FULL IAEA FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

HRG OF 02/14/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 02/14/18 - PROBATE NOTES

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY CAROLYN TOSHA

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY CAROLYN TOSHA

HRG OF 02/14/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 02/14/18 - PROBATE NOTES

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2018
  • PETITION FOR FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION W/FULL IAEA; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 02/14/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 02/14/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (PROBATE); DISPOSITION ENTRY OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (PROBATE); CASE COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • CONFIDENTIAL STATEMENT OF BIRTH DATE AND DRIVER'S LICENSE NUMBER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY CAROLYN TOSHA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON APPTING ADMINISTRATION RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • PROPOSED LETTERS RECEIVED (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION RE: FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION W/FULL IAEA FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S35P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE); Minutes; Receipt: 171030-0723 $465.00; 171030-0723-MC Reference Number 031-0055580095

    Read MoreRead Less