This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/11/2018 at 12:00:55 (UTC).

MTR OF EXIE MOORE

Case Summary

On 02/01/2017 MTR OF EXIE MOORE was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0038

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners, Not Classified By Court and Conservators

JAMES E MOORE

ANNIE R LAMBERT

Conservatee

EXIE MOORE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Conservatee Attorney

FISCHEL, EDWARD B

459 W. 4Th St.

San Bernardino, CA 92401

 

Court Documents

PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF TEMPORARY CONSERVATOR FILED BY PETIITON FOR CONSERVATORSHIP FILED 02/01/2017 OF JAMES MOORE

PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF TEMPORARY CONSERVATOR FILED BY PETIITON FOR CONSERVATORSHIP FILED 02/01/2017 OF JAMES MOORE

NOTIFICATION TO COURT OF ADDRESS OF CONSERVATORSHIP FILED

NOTIFICATION TO COURT OF ADDRESS OF CONSERVATORSHIP FILED

PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF CONSERVATOR OF THE PERSON AND ESTATE FILED.

PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF CONSERVATOR OF THE PERSON AND ESTATE FILED.

EXPARTE APPLICATION FOR GOOD CAUSE EXCEPTION TO NOTICE OF HEARING ON PTN FOR APPT OF TEMP FILED.

EXPARTE APPLICATION FOR GOOD CAUSE EXCEPTION TO NOTICE OF HEARING ON PTN FOR APPT OF TEMP FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

DUTIES OF CONSERVATOR AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT OF HANDBOOK FILED.

DUTIES OF CONSERVATOR AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT OF HANDBOOK FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2018
  • PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF CONSERVATOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • CLAIM RECEIVED VERIFIED AND FORWARDED TO DEPARTMENT S37 FOR SIGNATURE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • CLAIM IN THE AMOUNT OF $1830.00 RECEIVED FROM SANDY TURNER FOR 07/03/17 TO 08/04/18.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • NOTICE OF DEATH OF TEMP CONSERVATEE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF CONSERVATOR; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; TARA REILLY, JUDGE; CLERK: ALMA HERNANDEZ; COURT REPORTER KIM HORSTMEYER 11522; COURT ATTENDANT R KRETZMEIER; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY EDWARD B. FISCHEL PRESENT FOR EXIE.; ATTORNEY SANDY TURNER (GAL) PRESENT FOR EXIE MOORE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); COURT CLEARS PROBAT NOTES 1, 2 AND 8.; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF COUNSEL.; REASON: TO CLEAR PROBATE NOTE 7-COMPLETED MEDICAL CAPACITY DECLARATION NEEDED.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 10/30/18 AT 09:30 IN DEPARTMENT S37P.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • HRG OF 07/31/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • HRG OF 07/31/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON 07/31/18 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF CONSERVATOR; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; TARA REILLY, JUDGE; CLERK: SHANNON PRATT; COURT REPORTER KIM HORSTMEYER 11522; COURT ATTENDANT R KRETZMEIER; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY EDWARD FISCHEL PRESENT FOR EXIE MOORE.; ATTORNEY SANDY TURNER PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF COURT.; REASON: TO CLEAR PROBATE NOTES.; IF PROBATE NOTES ARE NOT CLEARED BY THE NEXT HEARING, THE COURT MAY DISMISS THE CASE.; THE CASE IS REFERRED TO LEGAL AID FOR LEGAL ASSISTANCE.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 07/31/18 AT 09:30 IN DEPARTMENT S37P.; NOTICE TO BE GIVEN BY COUNSEL.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • HRG OF 04/17/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
74 More Docket Entries
  • 02/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY EXIE MOORE IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • PROPOSED LETTERS RECEIVED (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DUTIES OF CONSERVATOR AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT OF HANDBOOK FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON APPTING CONSERVATRSHIP RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTIFICATION TO COURT OF ADDRESS OF CONSERVATORSHIP FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF CONSERVATOR OF THE PERSON AND ESTATE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (CONSERVATORSHIP)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S37P

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.