This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/11/2018 at 21:14:41 (UTC).

MTR OF ETHEL RYAN

Case Summary

On 09/13/2017 MTR OF ETHEL RYAN was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0905

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ROBERT RYAN

Decedent

ETHEL RYAN

Not Classified By Court

DEBORAH PHILIPS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

GAUDY LAW, INC

267 D Street

Upland, CA 91786

 

Court Documents

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF OBJECTION TO PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION BY MAIL ON 03/21/18 AS TO SEE ATTACHMENT, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF OBJECTION TO PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION BY MAIL ON 03/21/18 AS TO SEE ATTACHMENT, FILED.

OBJECTION TO PETITITON TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION OF REAL PROPERTY FILED BY DEBORAH PHILIPS

OBJECTION TO PETITITON TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION OF REAL PROPERTY FILED BY DEBORAH PHILIPS

OBJECTION TO PETITITON TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION OF REAL PROPERTY FILED BY DEBORAH PHILIPS

OBJECTION TO PETITITON TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION OF REAL PROPERTY FILED BY DEBORAH PHILIPS

HRG OF 04/12/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 04/12/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 04/12/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 04/12/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 03/01/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 03/01/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 03/01/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 03/01/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 01/18/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 01/18/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 01/18/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 01/18/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 01/18/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 01/18/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 12/07/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 12/07/17 - PROBATE NOTES

SUPPLEMENTAL TO PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY FILED. (IMAGED)

SUPPLEMENTAL TO PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY FILED. (IMAGED)

INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL: FINAL ILED.

INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL: FINAL ILED.

INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL: FINAL ILED.

INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL: FINAL ILED.

PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY FILED.

PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY FILED.

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2018
  • PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; JAMES MICHAEL WELCH, JUDGE; CLERK: SHANNON PRATT; COURT REPORTER CATHY ALBRITTON 7137; COURT ATTENDANT D NEWCOMB; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY STEVEN URENDA PRESENT FOR ROBERT RYAN.; DEBORAH PHILIPS PRESENT IN PRO PER.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); PETITION DENIED; WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; NEED TO FILE A PETITION TO PROBATE WILL, AND WILL CONTEST TO BE FILED BY THE OBJECTOR IN THAT; MATTER; COURT ALLOWS THAT PETITIONER CAN USE THE SAME CASE NUMBER.; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); DISPOSITION ENTRY COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • HRG OF 06/07/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • HRG OF 06/07/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; JAMES MICHAEL WELCH, JUDGE; CLERK: SHANNON PRATT; COURT REPORTER CATHY ALBRITTON 7137; COURT ATTENDANT D NEWCOMB; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY STEVEN URENDA PRESENT FOR ROBERT RYAN.; DEBORAH PHILIPS (OBJECTOR) PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); MS. PHILIPS HAS FILED HER OBJECTION WITH THE COURT THIS MORNING. MATTER IS CONTINUED FOR; COUNSEL TO REVIEW AND FILE A RESPONSE TO THE OBJECTION.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 06/07/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S36P.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON DEBORAH PHILIPS FOR OBJECTION IN THE AMOUNT OF $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY DEBORAH PHILIPS IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF OBJECTION TO PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION BY MAIL ON 03/21/18 AS TO SEE ATTACHMENT, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY DEBORAH PHILIPS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • OBJECTION TO PETITITON TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION OF REAL PROPERTY FILED BY DEBORAH PHILIPS

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 01/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 01/18/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 01/18/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; JAMES MICHAEL WELCH, JUDGE; CLERK: RACHELE ANDREWS; COURT REPORTER CATHY ALBRITTON 7137; COURT ATTENDANT D NEWCOMB; APPEARANCES:; SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY ATTORNEY NESA TARGHIBU FOR ATTORNEY JASON GAUDY.; AUDREY HERREN PRESENT IN PRO PER.; DEBORAH PHILIPS PRESENT IN PRO PER.; KATHY JOANN RYAN PRESENT IN PRO PER.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); PARTIES ARE PRESENT AND OBJECT TO THE PETITION.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 01/18/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S36P.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 12/07/17 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUPPLEMENTAL TO PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY FILED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON DETERMINING SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL: FINAL ILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION TO DETERMINE SUCCESSION TO REAL PROPERTY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S36P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE); Minutes; Receipt: 170913-0144 $465.00; 170913-0144-VS Reference Number 013108

    Read MoreRead Less