This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/11/2018 at 15:06:27 (UTC).

MTR OF ELLA MARIE BODELL

Case Summary

On 07/11/2017 MTR OF ELLA MARIE BODELL was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0261

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners, Not Classified By Court and Conservators

DAVID BODELL

SANDY TURNER

Conservatee

ELLA MARIE BODELL

Other

PLATTE RIVER INSURANCE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner, Not Classified By Court and Conservator Attorneys

MARTIN, TREVOR D.

300 E. State St. Ste.200

Redlands, CA 92373

TURNER, SANDRA

1574 Valencia Pl

Pomona, CA 91768

Conservatee Attorney

TURNER, SANDY L.

1574 Valencia Pl

Pomona, CA 91768

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2019
  • ACCOUNTING REVIEW BY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • CONSERVATORSHIP INVESTIGATOR REVIEW RE: CI ANNUAL REVIEW DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • CONSERVATORSHIP COMPLIANCE REVIEW HEARING ON PETITION FOR CONSERVATORSHIP FILED 07/11/2017 OF DAVID BODELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY DAVID BODELL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 180829-0414 $30.50; 180829-0414-VS Reference Number 031-0142134774

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • ORDER ON TN FOR SUBSTITUTED JUDGEMENT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • ORDER ON PTN FOR PAYMENT OF ATTY FEES FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • PETITION FOR FOR SUBSTITUTED JUDGEMENT TO: 1) CREATE AND FUND SPECIAL NEEDS TRUST; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; STANFORD E. REICHERT, JUDGE; CLERK: BRENDA TIRADO; COURT REPORTER CHERYL ORTEGA 13709; COURT ATTENDANT D MORENO; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY SANDY TURNER PRESENT FOR ELLA MARIE BODELL.; ATTORNEY TREVOR MARTIN PRESENT FOR DAVID BODELL.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); PETITION FOR SUBSTITUTED JUDGMENT TO: 1) CREATE AND FUND SPECIAL NEEDS TRUST IS GRANTED.; ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • CONSERVATORSHIP COMPLIANCE REVIEW HEARING ON PETITION FOR CONSERVATORSHIP FILED 07/11/2017 OF DAVID BODELL; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; STANFORD E. REICHERT, JUDGE; CLERK: BRENDA TIRADO; COURT REPORTER CHERYL ORTEGA 13709; COURT ATTENDANT D MORENO; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY SANDY TURNER PRESENT FOR ELLA MARIE BODELL.; ATTORNEY TREVOR MARTIN PRESENT FOR DAVID BODELL.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF COUNSEL.; REASON: TO CLEAR NOTES; COURT ORDERS MISSING DOCUMENTS AS STATED IN PROBATE NOTES ARE DUE BY 4:00PM NOVEMBER 5,; 2018; HEARING SET DECEMBER 5, 2018.; ATTORNEY SANDY TURNER REPRESENTS AN ADDITIONAL FEE PETITION WILL BE SUBMITTED; COURT ORDERS; HEARING ON PETITION TO BE SET DECEMBER 5, 2018.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 12/05/18 AT 09:30 IN DEPARTMENT S35P.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • PETITION FOR ATTORNEY FEES TO ATTORNEY SANDY TURNER FOR ELLA MARIE BODELL; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; STANFORD E. REICHERT, JUDGE; CLERK: BRENDA TIRADO; COURT REPORTER CHERYL ORTEGA 13709; COURT ATTENDANT D MORENO; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY SANDY TURNER PRESENT FOR ELLA MARIE BODELL.; ATTORNEY TREVOR MARTIN PRESENT FOR DAVID BODELL.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); NOTES CLEARED; PETITION FOR ATTORNEY FEES TO ATTORNEY SANDY TURNER FOR ELLA MARIE BODELL IS GRANTED.; ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE.; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION: SUBSEQUENT PETITION BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); DISPOSITION SUBSEQUENT PETITION BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
60 More Docket Entries
  • 07/11/2017
  • DUTIES OF CONSERVATOR AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT OF HANDBOOK FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • LIST OF REQUIRED CONTACT INFORMATION FOR CONSERVATORSHIPS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • NOTIFICATION TO COURT OF ADDRESS OF CONSERVATORSHIP FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON APPOINTING CONSERVATOR RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CITATION ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON TEMPORARY CONSERVATOR RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • PROPOSED LETTERS RECEIVED (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF TEMPORARY CONSERVATOR FILED BY DAVID BODELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF CONSERVATOR OF THE PERSON AND ESTATE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (CONSERVATORSHIP); Minutes; Receipt: 170711-0672 $555.00; 170711-0672-CK Reference Number 011095

    Read MoreRead Less