This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/11/2018 at 17:42:23 (UTC).

MTR OF ELEANOR D GEORGE

Case Summary

On 05/03/2017 MTR OF ELEANOR D GEORGE was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0425

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MELVIN GEORGE

Decedent

ELEANOR D GEORGE

Others

STATE OF CA FRANCHISE TAX BOARD

SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MICHAEL C. MADDUX

1894 Commercenter Dr. W, Ste. 108

San Bernardino, CA 92408

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION OF MELVIN GEORGE FILED

DECLARATION OF MELVIN GEORGE FILED

PETITION FOR LETTERS OF SPECIAL ADMINISTRATION FILED BY MELVIN GEORGE(PROBATE).

PETITION FOR LETTERS OF SPECIAL ADMINISTRATION FILED BY MELVIN GEORGE(PROBATE).

DECLARATION OF MELVIN GEORGE FILED

DECLARATION OF MELVIN GEORGE FILED

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY MELVIN GEORGE

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY MELVIN GEORGE

PETITION RE: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION W/FULL IAEA FILED.

PETITION RE: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION W/FULL IAEA FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2019
  • HEARING RE FINAL DISCHARGE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • ACCOUNTING REVIEW BY; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • HEARING RE: PRELIMINARY INJUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • DECLARATION AND ORDER FOR FINAL DISCHARGE FILED.; Minutes; ACTION - COMPLETE; CASE CLOSED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON EXPARTE PETITION FOR FINAL DISCHARGE AND ORDER RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • RECEIPT RE: DISTRIBUTE FOR PROPERTY RECEIVED BY KATHLEEN GIBB FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • RECEIPT RE: DISTRIBUTE FOR PROPERTY RECEIVED BY MELVIN GEORGE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • ORDER GRANTING FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF MELVIN GEORGE AND PETITION FOR ALLOWANCE OF FEES FILED.; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; JAMES MICHAEL WELCH, JUDGE; CLERK: RACHELE ANDREWS; COURT REPORTER CATHY ALBRITTON 7137; COURT ATTENDANT D NEWCOMB; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY MICHAEL MADDUX PRESENT FOR MELVIN GEORGE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); COURT AND COUNSEL CONFER ON THE RECORD.; FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNTING APPROVED/GRANTED.; COUNSEL TO SUBMIT ORDER.; HEARINGS:; HEARING RE FINAL DISCHARGE SET FOR 02/26/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S36P.; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION: SUBSEQUENT PETITION BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); DISPOSITION SUBSEQUENT PETITION BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
92 More Docket Entries
  • 05/03/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY MELVIN GEORGE IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON MELVIN GEORGE FOR NEW PETITION IN THE AMOUNT OF $465.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY MELVIN GEORGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • CONFIDENTIAL STATEMENT OF BIRTH DATE AND DRIVER'S LICENSE NUMBER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY MELVIN GEORGE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S36P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION RE: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION W/FULL IAEA FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • EX PARTE APP FOR TRO & OSC RE : PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less