This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/11/2018 at 21:26:45 (UTC).

MTR OF EDWARD EUGENE MILLER

Case Summary

On 09/25/2017 MTR OF EDWARD EUGENE MILLER was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0945

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Administrator

TINA MARIE RHODES

Decedent

EDWARD EUGENE MILLER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Administrator Attorney

SWEENEY, WILLIAM K

32371 Alipaz St. #29

San Juan Capistrano, CA 92675

 

Court Documents

ORDER APPOINTING ADMINISTRATOR, TINA MARIE RHODES APPOINTED WITH FULL IAEA. BOND 186,000.00, BM GARVIN APPOINTED PROBATE REFEREE, FILED.

ORDER APPOINTING ADMINISTRATOR, TINA MARIE RHODES APPOINTED WITH FULL IAEA. BOND 186,000.00, BM GARVIN APPOINTED PROBATE REFEREE, FILED.

HRG OF 01/02/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 01/02/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 01/02/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 01/02/18 - PROBATE NOTES

PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED.

PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED.

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY TINA MARIE RHODES

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY TINA MARIE RHODES

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY TINA MARIE RHODES

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY TINA MARIE RHODES

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

DEATH CERTIFICATE IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR PROBATE FILED.

DEATH CERTIFICATE IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR PROBATE FILED.

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY TINA MARIE RHODES

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY TINA MARIE RHODES

PETITION RE: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION WITH FULL AUTHORIZATION TO ADMINISTER UNDER IAEA FILED.

PETITION RE: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION WITH FULL AUTHORIZATION TO ADMINISTER UNDER IAEA FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2019
  • ACCOUNTING REVIEW BY; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF TINA MARIE RHODES AND PETITION FOR ALLOWANCE OF FEES FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • HRG OF 09/12/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • VACATE PRARV HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 03/05/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S36P.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • HRG OF 09/12/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON 09/12/18 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON SETTLING FIRST AND FINAL ACCT RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNTING REPORT FILED BY TINA MARIE RHODES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY TINA MARIE RHODES FOR FIRST AND FINAL ACCT; Minutes; Receipt: 180731-0948 $465.00; 180731-0948-VS Reference Number 031-0133126419

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY TINA MARIE RHODES FOR CERTIFIED COPIES; Minutes; Receipt: 180530-0876 $25.50; 180530-0876-CK Reference Number 257

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 10/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY TINA MARIE RHODES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON APPOINTING ADMINISTRATOR RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • PROPOSED LETTERS RECEIVED (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DEATH CERTIFICATE IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR PROBATE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY TINA MARIE RHODES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • CONFIDENTIAL STATEMENT OF BIRTH DATE AND DRIVER'S LICENSE NUMBER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION RE: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION WITH FULL AUTHORIZATION TO ADMINISTER UNDER IAEA FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE); Minutes; Receipt: 170925-0826 $465.00; 170925-0826-VS Reference Number 031-0045950483

    Read MoreRead Less